Case Last Refreshed: 2 weeks ago
Hovich, Leon, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Verba, Karina, in the jurisdiction of Miami-Dade County, FL, . Miami-Dade County, FL Superior Courts with FC47 - Downtown Miami - Judge Vizcaino, Diana presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 05, 2024 |
CategoryDiss Of Marriage W/Children |
Last RefreshedApril 11, 2024 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationMiami-Dade County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 25, 2024 | Hearing |
Uncontested Calendar UNCONTESTED FINAL HEARING ON PETITONER'S VERIFIED PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE AND OTHER RELIEF AND TO DISESTABLISH PATERNITY |
|
April 09, 2024 | Docket Event |
EFinal Judgment by Judge OF DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE AND DISESTABLISHMENT OF PATERNITY |
|
April 08, 2024 | Docket Event | Special affidavit to proceed without hearing | |
April 08, 2024 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Petitioner - Child Custody Jurisdiction | |
April 06, 2024 | Docket Event |
Receipt: RECEIPT#:3170080 AMT PAID:$409.00 NAME:FARBER, HELENA Y. 2750 NE 185 ST STE 302 AVENTURA FL 33180 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODE QUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3300-CIRCUIT FILING FEE 1 $409.00 $409.00 TENDER TYPE:EFILINGS TENDER AMT:$409.00 RECEIPT DATE:04/06/2024 REGISTER#:317 CASHIER:EFILINGUSER |
|
April 05, 2024 | Docket Event | Marital Settlement Agreement | |
April 05, 2024 | Docket Event | Answer and Waiver | |
April 05, 2024 | Docket Event | Required Information Sheet | |
April 05, 2024 | Docket Event | Civil Cover | |
April 05, 2024 | Docket Event | Petition |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.