Case Last Refreshed: 2 weeks ago
De La Cuesta, filed a(n) Malpractice - Torts case represented by Goldberg, Sidney A, against Steward Palmetto General Hospital, Steward Pgh, Inc., in the jurisdiction of Miami-Dade County, FL, . Miami-Dade County, FL Superior Courts with CA08 - Downtown Miami - Judge Watson, Robert presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 05, 2024 |
CategoryMedical Malpractice |
Last RefreshedApril 11, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationMiami-Dade County, FL |
Matter TypeMalpractice |
This complaint is a legal action for damages in excess of $50,000.00 filed by Marta Estela De La Cuesta, as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Roberto De La Cuesta, against Steward PGH, Inc. d/b/a Steward Palmetto General Hospital. The comp...
Complaint
Date: April 05, 2024Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 09, 2024 | Docket Event |
Receipt: RECEIPT#:3140159 AMT PAID:$10.00 NAME:GOLDBERG, SIDNEY A ONE S.E. 3RD AVENUE SUITE 3020 MIAMI FL 33131 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODE QUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE 1 $10.00 $10.00 TENDER TYPE:EFILINGS TENDER AMT:$10.00 RECEIPT DATE:04/09/2024 REGISTER#:314 CASHIER:EFILINGUSER |
|
April 08, 2024 | Docket Event | (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received | |
April 08, 2024 | Docket Event | 20 Day Summons Issued | |
April 08, 2024 | Docket Event |
ESummons 20 Day Issued RE: INDEX # 5. Parties: Steward PGH Inc. |
|
April 06, 2024 | Docket Event |
Receipt: RECEIPT#:3130264 AMT PAID:$401.00 NAME:GOLDBERG, SIDNEY A ONE S.E. 3RD AVENUE SUITE 3020 MIAMI FL 33131 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODE QUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3100-CIRCUIT FILING FEE 1 $401.00 $401.00 TENDER TYPE:EFILINGS TENDER AMT:$401.00 RECEIPT DATE:04/06/2024 REGISTER#:313 CASHIER:EFILINGUSER |
|
April 05, 2024 | Docket Event | Complaint | |
April 05, 2024 | Docket Event | Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.