Case Last Refreshed: 3 weeks ago
Norcisa, Adriana, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Norcisa, Jose, in the jurisdiction of Miami-Dade County, FL, . Miami-Dade County, FL Superior Courts with FC38 - Downtown Miami - Judge del Pino, Victoria presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeFC38 - Downtown Miami - Judge del Pino, Victoria Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 26, 2024 |
CategoryDissolution Of Marriage |
Last RefreshedApril 01, 2024 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationMiami-Dade County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 29, 2024 | Docket Event |
Receipt: RECEIPT#:3170037 AMT PAID:$10.00 NAME:REYES, CAROLYN ANN 12900 SW 128 ST STE 204A MIAMI FL 33186 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODE QUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3339-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE 1 $10.00 $10.00 TENDER TYPE:EFILINGS TENDER AMT:$10.00 RECEIPT DATE:03/29/2024 REGISTER#:317 CASHIER:EFILINGUSER |
|
March 28, 2024 | Docket Event | (M) ESummons (Sub) Received | |
March 27, 2024 | Docket Event |
Receipt: RECEIPT#:3090078 AMT PAID:$409.00 NAME:REYES, CAROLYN ANN 12900 SW 128 ST STE 204A MIAMI FL 33186 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODE QUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3300-CIRCUIT FILING FEE 1 $409.00 $409.00 TENDER TYPE:EFILINGS TENDER AMT:$409.00 RECEIPT DATE:03/27/2024 REGISTER#:309 CASHIER:EFILINGUSER |
|
March 26, 2024 | Docket Event | Civil Cover | |
March 26, 2024 | Docket Event | Petition | |
March 26, 2024 | Docket Event | Required Information Sheet | |
March 26, 2024 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing and Serving Administrative Order | |
March 26, 2024 | Docket Event | Notice of Appearance |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.