Case Last Refreshed: 3 weeks ago
Towdpoint Mortgage Trust 2019-4 Us Bank National, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Zion, Fran Elise, against Brown, Maria Nieto, City Of North Miami Florida, Gs Mortgage Backed Securities Trust 2019-Sl1, Nieto-Brown, Maria, in the jurisdiction of Miami-Dade County, FL, . Miami-Dade County, FL Superior Courts with CA23 - Downtown Miami - Judge Areces, Barbara presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCA23 - Downtown Miami - Judge Areces, Barbara Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 26, 2024 |
CategoryRpmf -Homestead |
Last RefreshedApril 01, 2024 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationMiami-Dade County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
This is a verified complaint to foreclose a mortgage filed by Towd Point Mortgage Trust 2019-4, U.S. Bank National Association, as Indenture Trustee, against Maria Nieto-Brown and other defendants. Maria Nieto-Brown executed a promissory note and mor...
Complaint
Date: March 26, 2024Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 28, 2024 | Docket Event |
Receipt: RECEIPT#:3170095 AMT PAID:$50.00 NAME:ZION, FRAN ELISE HELLER, ZION & SANCHEZ, LLP 2500 HOLLYWOOD BLVD, S HOLLYWOOD FL 33020 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODE QUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE 1 $10.00 $10.00 3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE 1 $10.00 $10.00 3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE 1 $10.00 $10.00 3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE 1 $10.00 $10.00 3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE 1 $10.00 $10.00 TENDER TYPE:EFILINGS TENDER AMT:$50.00 RECEIPT DATE:03/28/2024 REGISTER#:317 CASHIER:EFILINGUSER |
|
March 27, 2024 | Docket Event |
Receipt: RECEIPT#:3100249 AMT PAID:$911.00 NAME:ZION, FRAN ELISE HELLER, ZION & SANCHEZ, LLP 2500 HOLLYWOOD BLVD, S HOLLYWOOD FL 33020 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODE QUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3201-FORECLOSURE FILING 1 $906.00 $906.00 3142-RECORDING FEE 1 $5.00 $5.00 TENDER TYPE:EFILINGS TENDER AMT:$911.00 RECEIPT DATE:03/27/2024 REGISTER#:310 CASHIER:EFILINGUSER |
|
March 27, 2024 | Docket Event | (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received | |
March 27, 2024 | Docket Event | (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received | |
March 27, 2024 | Docket Event |
ESummons 20 Day Issued RE: INDEX # 14. Parties: CITY OF NORTH MIAMI FLORIDA |
|
March 27, 2024 | Docket Event | 20 Day Summons Issued | |
March 27, 2024 | Docket Event |
ESummons 20 Day Issued RE: INDEX # 16. |
|
March 27, 2024 | Docket Event |
ESummons 20 Day Issued RE: INDEX # 15. Parties: GS MORTGAGE BACKED SECURITIES TRUST 2019-SL1 |
|
March 27, 2024 | Docket Event |
ESummons 20 Day Issued RE: INDEX # 17. |
|
March 27, 2024 | Docket Event |
ESummons 20 Day Issued RE: INDEX # 18. Parties: NIETO-BROWN MARIA |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.