Case Last Refreshed: 3 weeks ago
Wilmington Savings Fund Society, Fsb, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Chin- Duncan, Karissa, against Gallo, Ines, Sainz, Ines, in the jurisdiction of Miami-Dade County, FL, . Miami-Dade County, FL Superior Courts with CA15 - Downtown Miami - Judge Rodriguez, Jose M presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCA15 - Downtown Miami - Judge Rodriguez, Jose M Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 26, 2024 |
CategoryRpmf -Non-Homestead |
Last RefreshedApril 01, 2024 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationMiami-Dade County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 28, 2024 | Docket Event |
ESummons 20 Day Issued RE: INDEX # 15. |
|
March 28, 2024 | Docket Event |
ESummons 20 Day Issued RE: INDEX # 14. Parties: GALLO INES SAINZ |
|
March 28, 2024 | Docket Event |
Receipt: RECEIPT#:3170167 AMT PAID:$40.00 NAME:CHIN- DUNCAN, KARISSA 100 W CYPRESS CREEK RD FORT LAUDERDALE FL 33309-2181 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODE QUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE 1 $10.00 $10.00 3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE 1 $10.00 $10.00 3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE 1 $10.00 $10.00 3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE 1 $10.00 $10.00 TENDER TYPE:EFILINGS TENDER AMT:$40.00 RECEIPT DATE:03/28/2024 REGISTER#:317 CASHIER:EFILINGUSER |
|
March 28, 2024 | Docket Event |
ESummons 20 Day Issued RE: INDEX # 17. |
|
March 28, 2024 | Docket Event | 20 Day Summons Issued | |
March 28, 2024 | Docket Event |
ESummons 20 Day Issued RE: INDEX # 16. |
|
March 27, 2024 | Docket Event | (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received | |
March 27, 2024 | Docket Event |
Receipt: RECEIPT#:3100218 AMT PAID:$1,911.00 NAME:CHIN- DUNCAN, KARISSA 100 W CYPRESS CREEK RD FORT LAUDERDALE FL 33309-2181 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODE QUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3201-FORECLOSURE FILING 1 $1,906.00 $1,906.00 3142-RECORDING FEE 1 $5.00 $5.00 TENDER TYPE:EFILINGS TENDER AMT:$1,911.00 RECEIPT DATE:03/27/2024 REGISTER#:310 CASHIER:EFILINGUSER |
|
March 26, 2024 | Docket Event | Notice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing | |
March 26, 2024 | Docket Event | Verification Form for Mortgage Foreclosure |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.