Case Last Refreshed: 1 week ago
Menendez, Elaine, filed a(n) Estate Administration - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Miami-Dade County, FL, . Miami-Dade County, FL Superior Courts with PMH 04 - Downtown Miami - Judge Santovenia, Maria de Jesus presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 19, 2024 |
CategoryFormal Administration |
Last RefreshedApril 25, 2024 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationMiami-Dade County, FL |
Matter TypeEstate Administration |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 24, 2024 | Docket Event | Oath of Personal Representative | |
April 24, 2024 | Docket Event |
Petition for Order Designating Depository TERRABANK |
|
April 23, 2024 | Docket Event |
Receipt: RECEIPT#:3150025 AMT PAID:$401.00 NAME:ROMERO, ROSA T. 2721 SW 117TH AVE DAVIE FL 33330-1431 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODE QUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3400-PROBATE CP FILING 1 $401.00 $401.00 TENDER TYPE:EFILINGS TENDER AMT:$401.00 RECEIPT DATE:04/23/2024 REGISTER#:315 CASHIER:EFILINGUSER |
|
April 22, 2024 | Docket Event |
Notice of Related Cases CASE 2020-1757-GD-02 |
|
April 19, 2024 | Docket Event | Petition for Administration | |
April 19, 2024 | Docket Event |
Death Certificate - Copy FOR RACHEL AGUIAR DELGADO |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.