Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Gpb Automotive Portfolio, Lp, Gpb Capital Holdings, Llc, Gpb Holdings Automotive, Llc, Gpb Holdings, Lp, Gpb Portfolio Automotive, Llc, (total of 5) See All filed a(n) Other Civil Complaint case represented by Paul A Shelowitz, against 2150 Aventura Realty Llc, Dibre, Patrick, represented by Santucci, Michael Ingrassi, in the jurisdiction of Miami-Dade County, FL, . Miami-Dade County, FL Superior Courts with Levitt, Elijah presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 08, 2023 |
CategoryOther Civil Complaint |
Last RefreshedJanuary 01, 2024 |
|
Filing LocationMiami-Dade County, FL |
|
Complaint
Date: August 08, 2023Motion:
Date: August 08, 2023Order Setting CM Deadline
Date: October 09, 2023Motion for Extension of Time
Date: December 26, 2023Order of Withdrawal as Attorney of Record
Date: November 08, 2023Motion to Withdraw
Date: November 03, 2023Request for Admissions
Date: December 26, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 28, 2023 | Docket Event |
Receipt: RECEIPT#:3080044 AMT PAID:$395.00 NAME:LEVITT, ELIJAH ABRAHAM 99 NE 4TH ST MIAMI FL 33132-2131 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODE QUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3103-CIRCUIT CROSS CLAI 1 $395.00 $395.00 TENDER TYPE:EFILINGS TENDER AMT:$395.00 RECEIPT DATE:12/28/2023 REGISTER#:308 CASHIER:EFILINGUSER Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
December 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion for Extension of Time Due Date: Complete Date: Parties: GPB Capital Holdings LLC; GPB Holdings LP; GPB Automotive Portfolio LP; GPB Holdings Automotive LLC; GPB Portfolio Automotive LLC |
|
December 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
Request for Admissions Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
December 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Interrogatory Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
December 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
Counter Claim Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
December 04, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Aside Default AGREED Due Date: Complete Date: Parties: Dibre Patrick; 2150 Aventura Realty LLC |
|
November 08, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order of Withdrawal as Attorney of Record Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
November 03, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion to Withdraw Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
November 03, 2023 | Docket Event |
Answer and Demand for Jury Trial Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
November 03, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion to Set Aside Default Due Date: Complete Date: |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.