Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Gonzalez, Adriana, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Rachel Edelsberg, against Restore Franchising Llc, Restore Hyper Wellness, in the jurisdiction of Miami-Dade County, FL, . Miami-Dade County, FL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 28, 2023 |
CategoryBusiness Transactions |
Last RefreshedAugust 27, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationMiami-Dade County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
This complaint is a putative class action filed by Adriana Gonzalez against Restore Franchising LLC, also known as Restore Hyper Wellness. The complaint alleges that the defendant violated the Florida Telephone Solicitation Act (FTSA) by engaging in ...
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 25, 2023 | Docket Event |
Voluntary Dismissal WITH PREJUDICE Due Date: Complete Date: Parties: Restore Franchising LLC; Restore Hyper Wellness |
|
July 25, 2023 | Docket Event |
Voluntary Dismissal Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
May 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
Service Returned Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
May 03, 2023 | Docket Event |
Receipt: RECEIPT#:3140207 AMT PAID:$10.00 NAME:RACHEL EDELSBERG 200 E BROWARD BLVD STE 1500 FORT LAUDERDALE FL 33301-1874 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODE QUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE 1 $10.00 $10.00 TENDER TYPE:EFILINGS TENDER AMT:$10.00 RECEIPT DATE:05/03/2023 REGISTER#:314 CASHIER:EFILINGUSER Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
May 02, 2023 | Docket Event |
ESummons 20 Day Issued RE: INDEX # 6. Due Date: Complete Date: Parties: Restore Franchising LLC |
|
May 02, 2023 | Docket Event |
20 Day Summons Issued Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
May 01, 2023 | Docket Event |
(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
April 29, 2023 | Docket Event |
Receipt: RECEIPT#:3110072 AMT PAID:$401.00 NAME:RACHEL EDELSBERG 200 E BROWARD BLVD STE 1500 FORT LAUDERDALE FL 33301-1874 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODE QUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3100-CIRCUIT FILING FEE 1 $401.00 $401.00 TENDER TYPE:EFILINGS TENDER AMT:$401.00 RECEIPT DATE:04/29/2023 REGISTER#:311 CASHIER:EFILINGUSER Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
April 28, 2023 | Docket Event |
Complaint Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
April 28, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion: CLASS CERTIFICATION Due Date: Complete Date: |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.