Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Culbreth-Williams, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Miles, Seth E, against Universal Property & Casualty Insurance Company, in the jurisdiction of Miami-Dade County, FL, . Miami-Dade County, FL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 04, 2023 |
CategoryContract & Indebtedness |
Last RefreshedAugust 23, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationMiami-Dade County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
This complaint is a class action lawsuit filed by Chanel Culbreth-Williams, individually and as the personal representative of the estate of Michael Williams, against Universal Property & Casualty Insurance Company. The complaint alleges that Univers...
Complaint
Date: April 04, 2023Motion to Stay
Date: May 01, 2023Stipulation for Dismissal
Date: May 12, 2023Amended Complaint
Date: May 02, 2023Order of Dismissal
Date: May 17, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal WITHOUT PREJUDICE Due Date: Complete Date: Parties: Universal Property & Casualty Insurance Company |
|
May 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal WITHOUT PREJUDICE Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
May 12, 2023 | Docket Event |
Stipulation for Dismissal Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
May 02, 2023 | Docket Event |
Amended Complaint Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
May 01, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion to Stay Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
April 10, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Service of Process Due Date: Complete Date: Parties: Universal Property & Casualty Insurance Company |
|
April 07, 2023 | Docket Event |
Receipt: RECEIPT#:3120110 AMT PAID:$10.00 NAME:MILES, SETH E 3350 MARY ST MIAMI FL 33133-5215 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODE QUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE 1 $10.00 $10.00 TENDER TYPE:EFILINGS TENDER AMT:$10.00 RECEIPT DATE:04/07/2023 REGISTER#:312 CASHIER:EFILINGUSER Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
April 06, 2023 | Docket Event |
ESummons 20 Day Issued RE: INDEX # 5. Due Date: Complete Date: Parties: Universal Property & Casualty Insurance Company |
|
April 06, 2023 | Docket Event |
20 Day Summons Issued Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
April 05, 2023 | Docket Event |
Receipt: RECEIPT#:3160312 AMT PAID:$401.00 NAME:MILES, SETH E 3350 MARY ST MIAMI FL 33133-5215 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODE QUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3100-CIRCUIT FILING FEE 1 $401.00 $401.00 TENDER TYPE:EFILINGS TENDER AMT:$401.00 RECEIPT DATE:04/05/2023 REGISTER#:316 CASHIER:EFILINGUSER Due Date: Complete Date: |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.