Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
American Express Natl Bank, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Scott E Modlin, against Villazon, Francisco, in the jurisdiction of Miami-Dade County, FL, . Miami-Dade County, FL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 14, 2021 |
CategoryContract And Indebtedness ($15,001 - $30,000) |
Last RefreshedDecember 14, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationMiami-Dade County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
This complaint is filed under the case number 136581255 and was electronically filed on October 14, 2021, at 03:28:08 PM. The text does not provide any specific information about the nature of the complaint or the parties involved. Therefore, it is n...
Complaint
Date: October 14, 2021Voluntary Dismissal
Date: February 04, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 04, 2022 | Docket Event |
Voluntary Dismissal Due Date: Complete Date: Parties: Villazon Francisco |
|
February 04, 2022 | Docket Event |
Voluntary Dismissal Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
February 02, 2022 | Docket Event |
Summons Returned - No Service Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
October 28, 2021 | Docket Event |
Receipt: RECEIPT#:3000167 AMT PAID:$10.00 NAME:SCOTT E MODLIN 1551 SAWGRASS CORPORATE PKWY STE 110 SUNRISE FL 33323-2832 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODE QUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE 1 $10.00 $10.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACH TENDER AMT:$10.00 RECEIPT DATE:10/28/2021 REGISTER#:300 CASHIER:EFILINGUSER Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
October 27, 2021 | Docket Event |
(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
October 27, 2021 | Docket Event |
20 Day Summons Issued Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
October 27, 2021 | Docket Event |
ESummons 20 Day Issued RE: INDEX # 4. Due Date: Complete Date: Parties: Villazon Francisco |
|
October 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
Receipt: RECEIPT#:3030275 AMT PAID:$400.00 NAME:SCOTT E MODLIN 1551 SAWGRASS CORPORATE PKWY STE 110 SUNRISE FL 33323-2832 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODE QUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2100-COUNTY FILING FEE 1 $400.00 $400.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACH TENDER AMT:$400.00 RECEIPT DATE:10/16/2021 REGISTER#:303 CASHIER:EFILINGUSER Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
October 14, 2021 | Docket Event |
Complaint $16985.94 Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
October 14, 2021 | Docket Event |
Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount Due Date: Complete Date: |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.