Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Tucker, Samuel, filed a(n) Trusts - Probate case against Tucker-Young, Cheryl, Young, Paul, in the jurisdiction of Miami-Dade County, FL, . Miami-Dade County, FL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 14, 2021 |
CategoryTrust Litigation |
Last RefreshedMay 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationMiami-Dade County, FL |
Matter TypeTrusts |
Complaint
Date: October 14, 2021Voluntary Dismissal
Date: November 19, 2021Lis Pendens
Date: October 15, 2021Service Returned
Date: October 22, 2021Affidavit of Service
Date: November 19, 2021ESummons 20 Day Issued
Date: October 18, 2021Notice:
Date: November 10, 2021Motion for Default
Date: November 12, 2021Notice:
Date: November 10, 2021Notice of Appearance
Date: November 19, 2021Motion to Withdraw
Date: January 11, 2022Notice:
Date: November 11, 2021Motion for Default
Date: November 11, 2021Email Notice:
Date: November 19, 2021Notice of Default Not Entered
Date: November 16, 2021Service Returned
Date: October 22, 2021ESummons 20 Day Issued
Date: October 18, 2021ESummons 20 Day Issued
Date: October 18, 2021Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount
Date: October 14, 2021(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received
Date: October 15, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 11, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion to Withdraw Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
November 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
Voluntary Dismissal Due Date: Complete Date: Parties: Tucker-Young Cheryl; Young Paul |
|
November 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
Affidavit of Service Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
November 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appearance Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
November 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
Email Notice: DIANAHOYEN@YAHOO.COM; Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
November 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
Voluntary Dismissal Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
November 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Default Not Entered Due Date: Complete Date: Parties: Tucker-Young Cheryl |
|
November 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion for Default Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
November 11, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice: WITHDRAWING. Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
November 11, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion for Default Due Date: Complete Date: |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.