Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Hernandez Marquez, Johnny H., filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Gal Sinclair, against Bautista, Sean A., Martinez, Steven, represented by Harrington, Timothy W., in the jurisdiction of Miami-Dade County, FL, . Miami-Dade County, FL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 14, 2021 |
CategoryAuto Negligence |
Last RefreshedSeptember 14, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationMiami-Dade County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
This complaint is filed in the Circuit Court of the 11th Judicial Circuit in and for Miami-Dade County, Florida. The plaintiff, Johnny H. Hernandez Marquez, is suing the defendants, Sean A. Bautista and Steven Martinez, for damages exceeding $30,000....
Complaint
Date: October 14, 2021Notice Of Serving Proposal For Settlement
Date: May 06, 2022Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: February 24, 2022Response to Request for Admissions
Date: February 24, 2022Order Setting CM Deadline
Date: February 24, 2022Agreed Order
Date: April 19, 2022Response to Request for Production
Date: March 17, 2022Notice of Answer to Interrogatories
Date: April 06, 2022Notice of Interrogatory
Date: February 04, 2022Notice of Appt of Medtrandcnfrnce
Date: April 26, 2022Response to Request for Admissions
Date: March 01, 2022Notice of Appearance
Date: February 04, 2022Request for Production
Date: February 17, 2022Motion to Amend
Date: April 15, 2022Request for Admissions
Date: February 17, 2022Response to Request for Production
Date: April 06, 2022Response to Request for Admissions
Date: April 06, 2022Reply to Answer
Date: February 17, 2022Notice of Interrogatory
Date: February 17, 2022ESummons 20 Day Issued
Date: October 19, 2021Answer and Affirmative Defense
Date: February 04, 2022Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount
Date: October 14, 2021Request for Production
Date: February 04, 2022Affidavit of:
Date: November 12, 2021(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received
Date: October 18, 2021ESummons 20 Day Issued
Date: October 19, 2021Request for Admissions
Date: February 04, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 06, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice Of Serving Proposal For Settlement Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
April 26, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appt of Medtrandcnfrnce Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
April 19, 2022 | Docket Event |
Agreed Order GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO AMEND RESPONSE TO ADMISSIONS Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
April 15, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion to Amend Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
April 06, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Answer to Interrogatories Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
April 06, 2022 | Docket Event |
Response to Request for Production Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
April 06, 2022 | Docket Event |
Response to Request for Admissions AMENDED Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
March 17, 2022 | Docket Event |
Response to Request for Production Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
March 01, 2022 | Docket Event |
Response to Request for Admissions Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
February 24, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Taking Deposition JUNE 1, 2022 @ 1:00 PM Due Date: Complete Date: |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.