Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Reverse Mortgage Funding Llc, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Meisels, Jonathan Ian, against Rodriguez, Gladys J, Rodriguez, Gladys Jimenez, United States Of America, in the jurisdiction of Miami-Dade County, FL, . Miami-Dade County, FL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 14, 2021 |
CategoryRpmf -Homestead |
Last RefreshedDecember 14, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationMiami-Dade County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
ESummons 20 Day Issued
Date: October 20, 2021ESummons 20 Day Issued
Date: October 20, 2021Service Returned
Date: November 01, 2021Lis Pendens
Date: October 15, 2021Voluntary Dismissal
Date: November 17, 2021Service Returned
Date: November 01, 2021Service Return for Unknown Party
Date: November 01, 2021Final Disposition Document
Date: November 17, 2021ESummons 20 Day Issued
Date: October 20, 2021(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received
Date: October 15, 2021(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received
Date: October 15, 2021Complaint
Date: October 14, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
Voluntary Dismissal Due Date: Complete Date: Parties: RODRIGUEZ GLADYS JIMENEZ; UNITED STATES OF AMERICA; RODRIGUEZ GLADYS J |
|
November 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
Final Disposition Document Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
November 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
Voluntary Dismissal Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
November 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
Service Returned Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
November 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
Service Returned Due Date: Complete Date: Parties: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA |
|
November 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
Service Return for Unknown Party Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
October 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
ESummons 20 Day Issued RE: INDEX # 7. Due Date: Complete Date: Parties: RODRIGUEZ GLADYS JIMENEZ |
|
October 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
ESummons 20 Day Issued RE: INDEX # 8. Due Date: Complete Date: Parties: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA |
|
October 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
ESummons 20 Day Issued RE: INDEX # 9. Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
October 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
20 Day Summons Issued Due Date: Complete Date: |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.