Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Vega, Fabricio, Vega, Linda, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Saldamando, Gregory, Schlosser, Braden, Esq, against Castillo, Yosvany Morejon, represented by Kassier, Andrew M., in the jurisdiction of Miami-Dade County, FL, . Miami-Dade County, FL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 14, 2021 |
CategoryAuto Negligence |
Last RefreshedOctober 15, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationMiami-Dade County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Complaint
Date: October 14, 2021Request for Production
Date: May 10, 2022Order Setting CM Deadline
Date: March 11, 2022Request for Production
Date: May 16, 2022Stipulation for Substitution of Counsel
Date: April 28, 2022Notice:
Date: April 28, 2022Notice To Change Attorney Of Record Within Firm
Date: May 10, 2022Notice of Filing:
Date: April 14, 2022Order Setting CM Deadline
Date: March 16, 2022Answer and Affirmative Defense
Date: May 16, 2022Copy of:
Date: October 14, 2021Notice of Interrogatory
Date: May 10, 2022Motion for Extension of Time
Date: January 07, 2022Notice of Appearance
Date: March 04, 2022Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount
Date: October 14, 2021(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received
Date: October 30, 2021ESummons 20 Day Issued
Date: November 02, 2021Notice of Hearing-
Date: February 27, 2022Affidavit of Service
Date: January 07, 2022Motion for Default
Date: January 07, 2022Notice of Answer to Interrogatories
Date: September 29, 2022Response to Request for Production
Date: September 13, 2022Response to Request for Production
Date: September 16, 2022Motion to Compel
Date: September 28, 2022Witness and Exhibit List
Date: September 12, 2022Motion for Extension of Time
Date: September 09, 2022Motion for Extension of Time
Date: September 12, 2022Notice of Interrogatory
Date: September 19, 2022Amended Notice of Hearing
Date: September 12, 2022Notice To Change Attorney Of Record Within Firm
Date: August 03, 2022Notice of Answer to Interrogatories
Date: October 06, 2022Notice To Change Attorney Of Record Within Firm
Date: December 23, 2022Order Extending Time for
Date: July 01, 2022Request for Production
Date: June 02, 2022Motion for Leave
Date: July 28, 2022Notice of Hearing-
Date: August 15, 2022Motion for Extension of Time
Date: June 29, 2022Motion for Extension of Time
Date: June 15, 2022Notice of Answer to Interrogatories
Date: July 21, 2022Notice of Interrogatory
Date: June 02, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 30, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order Granting Motion to Leave to Amend Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
July 11, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Change of Firm Name NEW FIRM NAME IS FIRST STOP LEGAL Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
July 10, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing- 08-08-2023 Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
June 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion for Leave Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
June 12, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion for Leave Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
April 27, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Cancellation of Hearing Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
April 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice: OF ATTORNEYS RETAINING LIEN AND CHARGING LIEN ON SETTLEMENT AND/OR JUDGMENT Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
April 24, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing- 24TH DAY OF MAY, 2023 AT 11 AM Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
April 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order for Substitution of Counsel Due Date: Complete Date: Parties: VEGA LINDA; VEGA FABRICIO |
|
April 07, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing Due Date: Complete Date: |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.