Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Arcia, Ortelio, Arcia, Sara, Arcia, Tatiana L., filed a(n) Insurance Coverage - Insurance case represented by Grande, Daniel, against Southern Fidelity Insurance Company, represented by Fernandez, Patricia Elizabeth, in the jurisdiction of Miami-Dade County, FL, . Miami-Dade County, FL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 14, 2021 |
CategoryInsurance Claim |
Last RefreshedSeptember 14, 2023 |
Practice AreaInsurance |
Filing LocationMiami-Dade County, FL |
Matter TypeInsurance Coverage |
Complaint
Date: October 14, 2021Request for Production
Date: October 14, 2021Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: March 02, 2022Notice of Service of Process
Date: October 27, 2021Notice of Answer to Interrogatories
Date: January 13, 2022Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: February 17, 2022Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: April 14, 2022Notice of Interrogatory
Date: March 21, 2022Subpoena Served
Date: April 21, 2022ESummons 20 Day Issued
Date: October 18, 2021Notice of Unavailability/absence
Date: May 13, 2022Privilege Log
Date: January 13, 2022Request for Production
Date: March 21, 2022Email Notice:
Date: October 14, 2021Agreed Order
Date: December 16, 2021Notice of Appearance
Date: November 04, 2021Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount
Date: October 14, 2021Email Notice:
Date: April 18, 2022Order Setting CM Deadline
Date: February 14, 2022Motion for Extension of Time
Date: April 18, 2022Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: May 11, 2022Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: February 15, 2022(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received
Date: October 15, 2021Notice of Interrogatory
Date: October 14, 2021Response to Request for Production
Date: January 13, 2022Agreed Order
Date: December 16, 2021Motion for Extension of Time
Date: November 16, 2021Order Extending Time for
Date: April 22, 2022Reply to Affirmative Defenses
Date: January 10, 2022Answer and Affirmative Defense
Date: January 05, 2022Notice of Cancellation of Deposition
Date: May 03, 2022Motion for Extension of Time
Date: December 10, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 13, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Unavailability/absence Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
May 11, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Taking Deposition Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
May 03, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Cancellation of Deposition Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
April 22, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order Extending Time for RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S INITIAL DISCOVERY REQUESTS-AGREED Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
April 21, 2022 | Docket Event |
Subpoena Served FOR THE PERSON WITH THE MOST KNOWLEDGE AT ADJUSTING EXPERTS, INC Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
April 18, 2022 | Docket Event |
Email Notice: ESERVICE@GRANDE-LAW.COM (AMENDED) Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
April 18, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion for Extension of Time Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
April 14, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Taking Deposition Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
March 21, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Interrogatory Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
March 21, 2022 | Docket Event |
Request for Production Due Date: Complete Date: |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.