Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Cesar, Ana, filed a(n) Premises Liability - Torts case represented by Jose Fuentes, against Walmart Inc., represented by Giesen, Jessica A., Esq, Terrance Hill, D, in the jurisdiction of Miami-Dade County, FL, . Miami-Dade County, FL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 14, 2021 |
CategoryComm Premises Liability |
Last RefreshedSeptember 14, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationMiami-Dade County, FL |
Matter TypePremises Liability |
Complaint
Date: October 14, 2021Motion for Extension of Time
Date: November 08, 2021(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received
Date: October 15, 2021Notice of Production
Date: March 09, 2022Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount
Date: October 14, 2021Notice of Appearance
Date: November 03, 2021Notice of Production
Date: March 31, 2022Request for Production
Date: March 10, 2022Request for Admissions
Date: March 10, 2022Motion for Extension of Time
Date: April 27, 2022Answer to Amended Complaint
Date: March 10, 2022Notice of Interrogatory
Date: March 10, 2022Motion to Dismiss
Date: December 01, 2021Motion for Default
Date: March 10, 2022ESummons 20 Day Issued
Date: October 18, 2021Notice:
Date: March 10, 2022Amended Complaint
Date: February 11, 2022Certificate of Mailing
Date: March 10, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 27, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion for Extension of Time Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
March 31, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Production Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
March 10, 2022 | Docket Event |
Request for Production Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
March 10, 2022 | Docket Event |
Request for Admissions Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
March 10, 2022 | Docket Event |
Answer to Amended Complaint Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
March 10, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Interrogatory Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
March 10, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion for Default Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
March 10, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice: OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR CLERK S DEFAULT Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
March 10, 2022 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Mailing Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
March 09, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Production Due Date: Complete Date: |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.