Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Aybar, Angela Josef, Aybar, Miguel Antonio, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Burdick, Isarel J, against White Pine Insurance Company, in the jurisdiction of Miami-Dade County, FL, . Miami-Dade County, FL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 14, 2021 |
CategoryContract & Indebtedness |
Last RefreshedOctober 03, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationMiami-Dade County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Complaint
Date: October 14, 2021Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount
Date: October 14, 2021Email Notice:
Date: October 14, 2021Notice of Interrogatory
Date: October 14, 2021(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received
Date: October 25, 2021Notice:
Date: January 26, 2022ESummons 20 Day Issued
Date: October 26, 2021Order to Serve Defendant
Date: January 05, 2022Order of Dismissal
Date: February 07, 2022Request for Production
Date: October 14, 2021Request for Admissions
Date: October 14, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal Due Date: Complete Date: Parties: WHITE PINE INSURANCE COMPANY |
|
February 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
January 26, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice: OF SETTLEMENT Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
January 05, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order to Serve Defendant Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
October 27, 2021 | Docket Event |
Receipt: RECEIPT#:3080034 AMT PAID:$10.00 NAME:BURDICK, ISAREL J 15715 S DIXIE HWY STE 319 MIAMI FL 33157-1883 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODE QUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE 1 $10.00 $10.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACH TENDER AMT:$10.00 RECEIPT DATE:10/27/2021 REGISTER#:308 CASHIER:EFILINGUSER Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
October 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
ESummons 20 Day Issued RE: INDEX # 8. Due Date: Complete Date: Parties: WHITE PINE INSURANCE COMPANY |
|
October 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
20 Day Summons Issued Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
October 25, 2021 | Docket Event |
(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
October 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
Receipt: RECEIPT#:3030159 AMT PAID:$401.00 NAME:BURDICK, ISAREL J 15715 S DIXIE HWY STE 319 MIAMI FL 33157-1883 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODE QUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3100-CIRCUIT FILING FEE 1 $401.00 $401.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACH TENDER AMT:$401.00 RECEIPT DATE:10/15/2021 REGISTER#:303 CASHIER:EFILINGUSER Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
October 14, 2021 | Docket Event |
Complaint Due Date: Complete Date: |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.