Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
South Florida Restoration, Llc, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Deprado, Joe, Esq, against Citizens Property Insurance Corporation, in the jurisdiction of Miami-Dade County, FL, . Miami-Dade County, FL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 14, 2021 |
CategoryContract & Indebtedness |
Last RefreshedOctober 03, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationMiami-Dade County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Request for Production
Date: October 14, 2021Notice of Interrogatory
Date: October 14, 2021Notice of Interrogatory
Date: March 11, 2022Order Extending Time for
Date: May 04, 2022Notice of Filing:
Date: January 09, 2022Request for Production
Date: March 11, 2022Notice of Answer to Interrogatories
Date: January 03, 2022Order Setting Jury Trial with Mediation Referral
Date: February 15, 2022Motion for Extension of Time
Date: April 12, 2022Motion for Extension of Time
Date: December 27, 2021Notice of Service of Process
Date: November 10, 2021ESummons 20 Day Issued
Date: October 28, 2021Privilege Log
Date: January 03, 2022Response to Request for Production
Date: January 03, 2022Notice of Appearance
Date: November 16, 2021Answer
Date: November 29, 2021Notice Of Serving Proposal For Settlement
Date: February 23, 2022Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount
Date: October 14, 2021Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: October 14, 2021(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received
Date: October 27, 2021Complaint
Date: October 14, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 26, 2022 | Hearing |
Calendar Call Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
May 04, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order Extending Time for RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF S DISCOVERY REQUESTS Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
April 12, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion for Extension of Time Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
March 11, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Interrogatory Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
March 11, 2022 | Docket Event |
Request for Production Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
February 23, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice Of Serving Proposal For Settlement Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
February 15, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Jury Trial with Mediation Referral 10/26/2022 @11:00AM Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
January 09, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing: JURAT PAGE Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
January 03, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Answer to Interrogatories Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
January 03, 2022 | Docket Event |
Privilege Log Due Date: Complete Date: |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.