Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Jpmorgan Chase Bank, N.A., filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Moehle, Kristina B, against Paredes, Yamiry, in the jurisdiction of Miami-Dade County, FL, . Miami-Dade County, FL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 30, 2021 |
CategoryContract And Indebtedness ($15,001 - $30,000) |
Last RefreshedOctober 12, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationMiami-Dade County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
This complaint is filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. against Yamiry Paredes in the County Court in Miami-Dade County, Florida. The complaint alleges that the defendant applied for and received a credit account from the plaintiff, but failed to make p...
Complaint
Date: June 30, 2021Motion for Final Judgment
Date: April 22, 2022Motion for Final Judgment
Date: September 24, 2021Voluntary Dismissal of Garnishment
Date: August 02, 2022Satisfaction of Judgment
Date: September 08, 2022Satisfaction of Judgment
Date: September 06, 2022Final Judgment Against Garnishee
Date: May 02, 2022Answer of Garnishee
Date: February 24, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 08, 2022 | Docket Event |
Satisfaction of Judgment Due Date: Complete Date: Parties: Paredes Yamiry |
|
September 06, 2022 | Docket Event |
Satisfaction of Judgment Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
September 06, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing: SATISFACTION OF FINAL JUDGMENT OF GARNISHMENT Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
August 02, 2022 | Docket Event |
Voluntary Dismissal of Garnishment Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
May 02, 2022 | Docket Event |
Final Judgment Against Garnishee Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
April 22, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion for Final Judgment Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
March 02, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice: TO DEFENDANT PURSUANT Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
February 24, 2022 | Docket Event |
Answer of Garnishee Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
February 11, 2022 | Docket Event |
Writ of Garnishment Returned Executed Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
February 11, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice: PURSUANT TO F.S. 77.041 Due Date: Complete Date: |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.