Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Oceania Iv Condominium Association, Inc., filed a(n) Insurance Coverage - Insurance case represented by Susan C Odess, against Certain Underwriters At Lloyds, London, General Security Indemnity Company Of Arizona, International Insurance Company Of Hannover Se, Interstate Fire & Casualty Company, represented by Jordon, Melissa V., Esq, in the jurisdiction of Miami-Dade County, FL, . Miami-Dade County, FL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 30, 2021 |
CategoryInsurance Claim |
Last RefreshedDecember 18, 2023 |
Practice AreaInsurance |
Filing LocationMiami-Dade County, FL |
Matter TypeInsurance Coverage |
This complaint is filed by Oceania IV Condominium Association, Inc. against Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London; International Insurance Company of Hannover SE; General Security Indemnity Company of Arizona; and Interstate Fire & Casualty Company...
Notice of Hearing-
Date: February 01, 2022ESummons 20 Day Issued
Date: July 14, 2021ESummons 20 Day Issued
Date: July 14, 2021Notice of Production
Date: January 11, 2022Objection:
Date: January 06, 2022Notice of Interrogatory
Date: January 26, 2022Order Setting CM Deadline
Date: January 06, 2022Order on Case Management Plan
Date: December 29, 2021Order to File
Date: December 07, 2021Privilege Log
Date: December 21, 2021Response:
Date: December 09, 2021Case Management Report
Date: December 16, 2021Motion to Strike
Date: December 29, 2021Notice of Production
Date: December 27, 2021Answer and Affirmative Defense
Date: December 09, 2021Order Extending Time for
Date: November 19, 2021Order Extending Time for
Date: October 27, 2021Motion:
Date: February 01, 2022Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount
Date: June 30, 2021Request for Production
Date: June 30, 2021Request for Copies
Date: January 27, 2022Request for Production
Date: January 26, 2022Order Extending Time for
Date: October 05, 2021Motion for Extension of Time
Date: October 25, 2021ESummons 20 Day Issued
Date: July 14, 2021Request for Copies
Date: January 26, 2022Motion for Extension of Time
Date: October 15, 2021Motion for Extension of Time
Date: September 20, 2021ESummons 20 Day Issued
Date: July 14, 2021Motion to Compel
Date: January 28, 2022Complaint
Date: June 30, 2021Notice of Appearance
Date: September 20, 2021(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received
Date: July 01, 2021Notice of Production
Date: February 28, 2022Notice of Cancellation of Hearing
Date: April 19, 2022Notice of Mediation Conference
Date: March 06, 2022Notice:
Date: March 02, 2022Subpoena Served
Date: February 23, 2022Motion for Extension of Time
Date: February 25, 2022Order Setting Jury Trial with Mediation Referral
Date: April 18, 2022Order Setting Case Management Conference
Date: March 02, 2022Notice of Compliance
Date: March 11, 2022Order Extending Time for
Date: March 13, 2022Notice of Answer to Interrogatories
Date: April 22, 2022Response to Request for Production
Date: April 22, 2022Notice:
Date: May 03, 2022Notice of Unavailability/absence
Date: March 22, 2022Notice of Compliance
Date: April 11, 2022Order Extending Time for
Date: March 28, 2022Subpoena Served
Date: March 31, 2022Order Setting Case Management Conference
Date: March 14, 2022Order Extending Time for
Date: April 11, 2022Order Extending Time for
Date: April 18, 2022Subpoena Served
Date: February 23, 2022Notice of Mediation Conference
Date: May 05, 2022Motion to Show Cause
Date: March 11, 2022Order Setting Case Management Conference
Date: March 03, 2022Request for Copies
Date: March 11, 2022Amended Notice of Hearing
Date: March 24, 2022Request:
Date: February 18, 2022Subpoena Served
Date: February 18, 2022Service Returned
Date: August 06, 2021Subpoena Served
Date: February 14, 2022Service Returned
Date: August 04, 2021Service Returned
Date: August 06, 2021Service Returned
Date: August 06, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 27, 2023 | Hearing |
Calendar Call Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
May 05, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Mediation Conference Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
May 03, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice: STIPULATION OF MEDIATOR Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
April 22, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Answer to Interrogatories Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
April 22, 2022 | Docket Event |
Response to Request for Production Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
April 20, 2022 | Hearing |
Motion Calendar DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR ENTRY UPON LAND Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
April 19, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Cancellation of Hearing Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
April 18, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Jury Trial with Mediation Referral 2/6/2023 Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
April 18, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order Extending Time for AGREED ORDER ON PLAINTIFF'S THIRD REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO DEFENDANTS' DISCOVERY REQUESTS Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
April 11, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Compliance Due Date: Complete Date: |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.