Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Papastravo, Maickoll, filed a(n) Product Liability case represented by Dandashly, Mustafa H., against Becton Dickinson And Company, C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc, in the jurisdiction of Miami-Dade County, FL, . Miami-Dade County, FL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 11, 2021 |
CategoryProduct Liability |
Last RefreshedOctober 14, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationMiami-Dade County, FL |
|
Service Returned
Date: July 26, 2021Amended Complaint
Date: July 01, 2021ESummons 20 Day Issued
Date: June 24, 2021Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount
Date: June 11, 2021Request for Production
Date: June 11, 2021Notice of Interrogatory
Date: June 11, 2021Service Returned
Date: July 26, 2021Service Returned
Date: July 26, 2021Notice of Removal to Federal Court
Date: August 16, 2021ESummons 20 Day Issued
Date: June 24, 2021ESummons 20 Day Issued
Date: July 20, 2021ESummons 20 Day Issued
Date: June 24, 2021ESummons 20 Day Issued
Date: July 20, 2021(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received
Date: June 24, 2021(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received
Date: July 12, 2021ESummons 20 Day Issued
Date: July 20, 2021Complaint
Date: June 11, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Removal to Federal Court Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
August 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Removal to Federal Court Due Date: Complete Date: Parties: C.R. BARD INC; DAVOL INC; BECTON DICKINSON AND COMPANY |
|
July 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
Service Returned Due Date: Complete Date: Parties: DAVOL INC |
|
July 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
Service Returned Due Date: Complete Date: Parties: C.R. BARD INC |
|
July 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
Service Returned Due Date: Complete Date: Parties: BECTON DICKINSON AND COMPANY |
|
July 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
ESummons 20 Day Issued RE: INDEX # 15. Due Date: Complete Date: Parties: DAVOL INC |
|
July 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
ESummons 20 Day Issued RE: INDEX # 14. Due Date: Complete Date: Parties: C.R. BARD INC |
|
July 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
ESummons 20 Day Issued RE: INDEX # 16. Due Date: Complete Date: Parties: BECTON DICKINSON AND COMPANY |
|
July 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
20 Day Summons Issued Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
July 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
Receipt: RECEIPT#:2950077 AMT PAID:$30.00 NAME:DANDASHLY, MUSTAFA H. GOLDBERG & ROSEN, P.A. 1111 BRICKELL AVENUE SUITE MIAMI FL 33131 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODE QUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE 1 $10.00 $10.00 3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE 1 $10.00 $10.00 3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE 1 $10.00 $10.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACH TENDER AMT:$30.00 RECEIPT DATE:07/16/2021 REGISTER#:295 CASHIER:EFILINGUSER Due Date: Complete Date: |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.