Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Optimum Spine Chiropractic Center, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Patino, Richard, against Infinity Auto Insurance Company, represented by Pargas, Natasha, Esq, in the jurisdiction of Miami-Dade County, FL, . Miami-Dade County, FL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 14, 2021 |
CategoryPersonal Injury Protection ($8,001 - $15,000) |
Last RefreshedOctober 16, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationMiami-Dade County, FL |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
This complaint is filed by Optimum Spine Chiropractic Center on behalf of Andrea Nogueira against Infinity Auto Insurance Company. The complaint seeks money damages, a declaration under Chapter 86 of the Florida Statutes, and injunctive relief relate...
Order Setting CM Deadline
Date: December 27, 2021Complaint
Date: October 14, 2021Request for Admissions
Date: October 14, 2021Request for Production
Date: October 14, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 27, 2023 | Docket Event |
Letter of Correspondence TO ADRIAN RIVERA, ESQ. FROM RICHARD PATINO, ESQ. (WITH ATTACHED MOTION TO COMPEL AND UNSIGNED ORDER) Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
May 27, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion/petit for Enforcement COURT ORDER DATED DECEMBER 20, 2022 Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
March 04, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Change of Address Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
January 03, 2023 | Docket Event |
Answer and Affirmative Defense Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
January 03, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion to Dismiss Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
December 28, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appearance Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
December 20, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order: DEFENDANT TO RESPOND IN 10 DAYS Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
December 14, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion: PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR DEFAULT (EX-PARTE) Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
December 13, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion: Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
July 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
Request for Admissions Due Date: Complete Date: |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.