Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Milgem, Angelina, filed a(n) Estate Administration - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Miami-Dade County, FL, . Miami-Dade County, FL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 14, 2021 |
CategorySummary Administration $1000 And More |
Last RefreshedAugust 24, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationMiami-Dade County, FL |
Matter TypeEstate Administration |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
Will 2 PGS Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
October 27, 2021 | Docket Event |
Death Certificate ORIGINAL Due Date: Complete Date: Parties: Milgem Roberto |
|
October 27, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order of Summary Administration Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
October 27, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order Determining Homestead Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
October 27, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order Admitting Will to Probate Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
October 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
Checklists and Certification Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
October 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
Death Certificate ORIGINAL Due Date: Complete Date: Parties: Milgem Roberto |
|
October 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
Pending Will Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
October 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
Receipt: RECEIPT#:3040043 AMT PAID:$346.00 NAME:AREVALO, CYNTHIA JACQUELINE 4000 HOLLYWOOD BLVD SUITE 265-SOUTH HOLLYWOOD FL 33021-6751 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODE QUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3400-PROBATE CP FILING 1 $346.00 $346.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACH TENDER AMT:$346.00 RECEIPT DATE:10/19/2021 REGISTER#:304 CASHIER:EFILINGUSER Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
October 14, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Confidential Info Within Court Filing Accepted Due Date: Complete Date: |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.