Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Machado, Teresita, filed a(n) Estate Administration - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Miami-Dade County, FL, . Miami-Dade County, FL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 11, 2021 |
CategoryFormal Administration |
Last RefreshedAugust 27, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationMiami-Dade County, FL |
Matter TypeEstate Administration |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 22, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order of Discharge Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
March 22, 2022 | Docket Event |
SRS Disposed by Judge (Case Status Closed) Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
March 21, 2022 | Docket Event |
Checklists and Certification Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
January 27, 2022 | Docket Event |
Receipt of Beneficiary and Consent to Discharge Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
January 19, 2022 | Docket Event |
Final Accounting Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
January 17, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order Authorizing Settlement Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
January 14, 2022 | Docket Event |
Verified Statement as to Creditors Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
January 14, 2022 | Docket Event |
Petition for Discharge Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
January 14, 2022 | Docket Event |
Final Accounting Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
January 14, 2022 | Docket Event |
Report of Distribution Due Date: Complete Date: |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.