Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Gonzalez, Lillanis, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Ayscue, Kenneth, in the jurisdiction of Miami-Dade County, FL, . Miami-Dade County, FL Superior Courts with Elisabeth M. Espinosa presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 23, 2020 |
CategoryStalking |
Last RefreshedDecember 22, 2022 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationMiami-Dade County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 28, 2022 | Hearing |
DV Hearing PERMANENT INJUNCTION HEARING Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
February 28, 2022 | Docket Event |
Memorandum of Disposition Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
February 28, 2022 | Docket Event |
Injunx Dismissed: No Just Cause Sugg Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
February 25, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion for Rehearing Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
February 24, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order Denying Continuance Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
February 23, 2022 | Docket Event |
Subpoena Served Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
February 22, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion for Continuance PETITIONER Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
February 21, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing: CASE LAW & STATUE FROM PETITIONER Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
February 21, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice: OF INTENT TO ADMIT CERTIFIED BUSINESS RECORD(S) Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
February 15, 2022 | Docket Event |
Subpoena Due Date: Complete Date: |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.