Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Benjamin, Blade, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Saint Germain, Marie, in the jurisdiction of Miami-Dade County, FL, . Miami-Dade County, FL Superior Courts with Elisabeth M. Espinosa presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 03, 2020 |
CategoryStalking |
Last RefreshedJanuary 06, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationMiami-Dade County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 29, 2020 | Docket Event |
Injunx Dismissed: No Just Cause Sugg Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
September 29, 2020 | Docket Event |
Memorandum of Disposition Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
September 25, 2020 | Docket Event |
Memorandum of Disposition Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
September 25, 2020 | Hearing |
DV Hearing PERMANENT INJUNCTION HEARING Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
September 23, 2020 | Docket Event |
Motion for Extension of Time Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
September 23, 2020 | Docket Event |
Extension of Injunction EXPIRATION DATE FOR THIS INJUNCTION IS:09/25/2020 Due Date: 09/25/2020 Complete Date: Parties: Benjamin Blade; Saint Germain Marie |
|
September 22, 2020 | Hearing |
DV Hearing PERMANENT INJUNCTION HEARING Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
September 21, 2020 | Docket Event |
Motion for Continuance PETITIONER Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
July 24, 2020 | Hearing |
DV Hearing Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
July 24, 2020 | Docket Event |
Motion for Extension of Time Due Date: Complete Date: |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.