Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Doubront, Carlos, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Henriquez, Marcelo, in the jurisdiction of Miami-Dade County, FL, . Miami-Dade County, FL Superior Courts with Christine P. Bandin presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 22, 2019 |
CategoryStalking |
Last RefreshedJanuary 11, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationMiami-Dade County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Permanent Injunction
Date: January 09, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 21, 2020 | Docket Event |
Summons Returned - No Service Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
February 19, 2020 | Docket Event |
Summons Returned - No Service Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
January 09, 2020 | Docket Event |
Permanent Injunction AGREED EXPIRES 1/16/2021 (ALSO APPEARS IN BOOK 31777 PAGE 1563) Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
December 20, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing- 01/16/2020- 10:00 AM , ROOM: 21-A Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
November 27, 2019 | Docket Event |
Summons Returned - No Service Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
November 14, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order to Appear for Hearing on Injunction 12/19/2019 @ 2:00 PM, ROOML 21-A Due Date: Complete Date: Parties: Henriquez Marcelo |
|
November 14, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing- 12/19/2019 @ 2:00 PM, ROOM: 21-A Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
November 13, 2019 | Docket Event |
Motion: Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
November 13, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appearance Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
November 01, 2019 | Docket Event |
Subpoena Duces Tecum PLAINTIFF'S OF EMILIO ESCALONA TO APPEAR AT EVIDENTIARY HEARING Due Date: Complete Date: |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.