Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Fernandez, Ulisses, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Robert Dixon, against Jurado, Diego F, Lucas David Design Inc, represented by Millon, Juliana Patricia, in the jurisdiction of Miami-Dade County, FL, . Miami-Dade County, FL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 21, 2019 |
CategoryAuto Negligence |
Last RefreshedJuly 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationMiami-Dade County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Notice of Mediation Conference
Date: May 21, 2020Mediators Report
Date: August 10, 2020Notice:
Date: August 28, 2020Order of Dismissal
Date: September 23, 2020Motion:
Date: September 15, 2020Notice of Hearing-
Date: October 22, 2020Order Resetting Trial/Final Hearing
Date: May 19, 2020Notice of Unavailability/absence
Date: November 16, 2020Order:
Date: December 01, 2020Notice of Appearance
Date: November 16, 2020Motion:
Date: September 22, 2020Motion:
Date: November 23, 2020Notice of Hearing-
Date: September 29, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 01, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order: ON MOTION FOR EQUITABLE DISTRIBUTION Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
November 24, 2020 | Hearing |
Special Sets PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR EQUITABLE DISTRIBUTION OF SETTLEMENT PROCEEDS Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
November 23, 2020 | Docket Event |
Motion: FOR EQUITABLE DISTRIBUTION OF SETTLEMENT FUNDS Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
November 16, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice of Unavailability/absence Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
November 16, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appearance Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
October 22, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing- ON 11-24-2020 AT 11AM Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
October 08, 2020 | Hearing |
Motion Calendar PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
September 29, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing- THURSDAY, OCTOBER 8, 2020 AT 9 AM Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
September 23, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal WITHOUT PREJUDICE Due Date: Complete Date: Parties: Jurado Diego F; Lucas David Design Inc |
|
September 23, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal SRS12 Due Date: Complete Date: |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.