Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Arroyo, John Morrice, filed a(n) Elder Abuse - Torts case represented by In Pro Per, against Bustos, Joshua M, represented by In Pro Per, in the jurisdiction of Amador County. This case was filed in Amador County Superior Courts with Renee C. Day presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 26, 2021 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
Last RefreshedDecember 10, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationAmador County, CA |
Matter TypeElder Abuse |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 24, 2021 | Docket Event |
CALIFORNIA COURTS PROTECTIVE ORDER REGISTRY (CCPOR) UPDATED WITH FORM # ________ CALIFORNIA COURTS PROTECTIVE ORDER REGISTRY (CCPOR) UPDATED WITH FORM #CH130_ |
|
May 24, 2021 | Docket Event |
ORDER AFTER HEARING CH-130 CIVIL HARASSMENT RESTRAINING ORDER AFTER HEARING IN PRO PER (Attorney) on behalf of JOHN MORRICE ARROYO (PLAINTIFF) |
|
May 18, 2021 | Docket Event |
CLERK'S MINUTES D ESPEY: SUPERIOR COURT OF CALIFORNIA, COUNTY OF AMADOR JOHN MORRICE ARROYO, Plaintiff: 1 PRESENT 0 NOT PRESENT IN PRO PER, Attorney for Plaintiff: 0 PRESENT 0 NOT PRESENT JOSHUA M BUSTOS, Defendant: 1 PRESENT 0 NOT PRESENT IN PRO PER, Attorney for Defendant: 0 PRESENT 0 NOT PRESENT ___2:51_______ 0 A.M. 1 P.M. Matter called. 0 Called and trailed. Matter recalled at: ____________ 0 Matter not on calendar, but placed on calendar per Judge 0 Stipulation for Commissioner to act as Temporary Judge for All Purposes DATE: May 17, 2021 CASE NUMBER: 21-CVC-12086 JUDGE: 0 J.S. Hermanson 1 Renee Day 0 Commissioner Andrea Sexton 0 Other: REPORTER: 0 T. Blakely 0 M. Bold 0 Other: BAILIFF: 0 J. Coletti 0 D. MacCaughey 0 M. Rice 1 Other: E. LARSEN CLERK: 0 J. Giron 0 C. Nunez 1 D. Espey 0 A. Carter 0 A. Jones-Williams 0 Other:Request for Restraining Order 1 CIVIL HARASSMENT 1 ELDER/ADULT ABUSE 0 WORKPLACE HARASSMENT 0 Ex Parte Hearing 0 Short Cause Hearing 1 Contested Hearing 1 Continued from 5/13/21 1 Plaintiff is sworn previously and testifies 1 Defendant is sworn previously and testifies 1 Witnesses are sworn previously and testify: __ @2:58 P.M. LELANI NOELLE ARROYO __________________________________ 0 Exhibits are marked for identification 0 Exhibits are received/admitted into evidence FINDINGS: 1 Court finds that notice has been given as required by law. 0 Defendant has failed to appear. 0 Court finds no service has occurred. ORDERS: 0 Stay Away is 0 ordered as requested 0modified to __________ yards 1 Personal Conduct orders granted 0 Temporary orders reissued pending the next hearing. All current orders remain in full force and effect 0 Plaintiff/Defendant to prepare and submit an Order on Request to Continue Hearing 0 Temporary orders reissued pending the next hearing with modifications (see Other Orders) 0 Plaintiff/Defendant to prepare and submit an Amended Temporary Restraining Order 0 Service is not required 0 Service upon Restrained Party required 0 Request for Restraining Order is denied 0 Court finds no appearance by the moving party. Case is dismissed 0 with 0 without prejudice OTHER FINDINGS: THE COURT HEARD TESTIMONY FROM CODE ENFORCEMENT. COURT ORDERS THAT MR. BUSTOS DOES NOT HARASS MR. ARROYO AND ORDERS PEACEFUL CONTACT. MOVE OUT ORDERS DO NOT APPLY TO THIS REQUEST AND MAY BE REMEDIED THROUGH CODE ENFORCEMENT OR UNLAWFUL DETAINER ACTIONS. A ONE YEAR PEACEFUL CONTACT ORDER IS GRANTED. DEFENDANT IS TO BE NICE TO THE DOGS AS WELL. PLAINTIFF TO PREPARE AN ORDER AFTER HEARING WITH THESE TERMS AND CONDITIONS AND TURN INTO THE CLERK’S OFFICE. NO PERSONAL SERVICE IS REQUIRED AS PARTIES ARE PRESENT. OTHER ORDERS: 1 Other CLERK PROVIDES CONTACT NUMBER TO LEGAL SERVICES OF NORTHERN CALIFORNIA.
Judge: Judge 0 Stipulation for Commissioner to act as Temporary Judge for All Purposes DATE: May 17, 2021 CASE NUMBER: 21-CVC-12086 JUDGE: 0 J.S. Hermanson 1 Renee Day 0 Commissioner Andrea Sexton 0 Other: REPORTER: 0 T. Blakely 0 M. Bold 0 Other: BAILIFF |
|
May 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF NEW HEARING DATE AND ORDER ON REISSUANCE ORDER ON REQUEST TO CONTINUE HEARING. GRANTED. IN PRO PER (Attorney) on behalf of JOHN MORRICE ARROYO (PLAINTIFF) |
|
May 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
CALIFORNIA COURTS PROTECTIVE ORDER REGISTRY (CCPOR) UPDATED WITH FORM # ________ CALIFORNIA COURTS PROTECTIVE ORDER REGISTRY (CCPOR) UPDATED WITH FORM # EA116 |
|
May 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
HEARING SET: The following event: CONTESTED HEARING ON OSC FOR TRO (ELDER ABUSE) scheduled for 05/13/2021 at 1:30 pm has been rescheduled as follows: Event: CONTESTED HEARING ON OSC FOR TRO (ELDER ABUSE) Date: 05/17/2021 Time: 1:30 pm Judge: DAY, RENEE Location: DEPT 2 Result: GRANTED
Judge: DAY, RENEE |
|
April 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF NEW HEARING DATE AND ORDER ON REISSUANCE ORDER ON REQUEST TO CONTINUE HEARING. |
|
April 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
CALIFORNIA COURTS PROTECTIVE ORDER REGISTRY (CCPOR) UPDATED WITH FORM # ________ CALIFORNIA COURTS PROTECTIVE ORDER REGISTRY (CCPOR) UPDATED WITH FORM # EA-116. |
|
April 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
HEARING SET: The following event: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (SHORT CAUSE HEARING) TRO (EA) scheduled for 04/19/2021 at 11:00 am has been rescheduled as follows: Event: CONTESTED HEARING ON OSC FOR TRO (ELDER ABUSE) Date: 05/13/2021 Time: 1:30 pm Judge: SEXTON, ANDREA Location: DEPT 3 Result: CONTINUED ON COURT'S MOTION
Judge: SEXTON, ANDREA |
|
April 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
CLERK'S MINUTES A JONES-WILLIAMS: Event: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (SHORT CAUSE HEARING) TRO (EA) Date: 04/19/2021 Time: 11:00 am Judge: SEXTON, ANDREA Location: DEPT 3 Result: CONTINUED ON COURT'S MOTION - Matter is continued to May 13, 2021 at 1:30pm in dept 3 for Contested Hearing on TRO.
Judge: SEXTON, ANDREA |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.