Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Champion Mortgage Company, Nationstar Mortgage Llc, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Vouis, Lynn Marie, against Florida Housing Finance Corporation, Marshall, Robert, Marshall, Ruthie, Miami Dade County Clerk Of The Circuit Court, United States Of America Acting Through Secretary, (total of 7) See All represented by Finley, Christopher, Zachem, Betty J, in the jurisdiction of Miami-Dade County, FL, . Miami-Dade County, FL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 11, 2018 |
CategoryRpmf -Homestead ($50,001 - $249,999) |
Last RefreshedSeptember 13, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationMiami-Dade County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
This complaint is a foreclosure action filed by Nationstar Mortgage, LLC d/b/a Champion Mortgage Company against various defendants. The plaintiff alleges that it holds the note and mortgage for a reverse mortgage on a property located in Miami-Dade ...
Assignment of Bid
Date: December 26, 2019Final Judgment by Judge
Date: October 01, 2019Response:
Date: June 18, 2019Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: July 26, 2019Complaint
Date: December 11, 2018Motion to Compel
Date: May 28, 2019Answer
Date: January 08, 2019Order:
Date: February 11, 2020Motion to Compel
Date: May 23, 2019Notice of Hearing-
Date: February 09, 2022Notice of Appearance
Date: October 06, 2021Motion for Surplus Funds
Date: February 03, 2022Notice of Hearing-
Date: January 14, 2022Notice of Hearing-
Date: February 01, 2022Notice of Hearing-
Date: October 07, 2021Motion to Disb Crt Reg Monies
Date: October 06, 2021Order Granting Disbursement of Surplus Funds
Date: February 20, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 28, 2022 | Docket Event |
Mortgage Foreclosure Check Mailed NATION LAWYERS TRUST ACCOUNT // 99877 Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
February 28, 2022 | Docket Event |
Mortgage Foreclosure Check Mailed RUTHIE MARSHALL // 99904 Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
February 24, 2022 | Docket Event |
Receipt: RECEIPT#:2140002 AMT PAID:$30.00 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODE QUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3234-SURPLUS DISBURSEME 1 $30.00 $30.00 TENDER TYPE:CHECK TENDER AMT:$30.00 RECEIPT DATE:02/24/2022 REGISTER#:214 CASHIER:E323503 Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
February 23, 2022 | Docket Event |
Mortgage Foreclosure Voucher Issued RUTHIE MARSHALL // 99904 Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
February 23, 2022 | Docket Event |
Mortgage Foreclosure Voucher Issued HARVEY RUVIN, CLERK // 99876 Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
February 23, 2022 | Docket Event |
Mortgage Foreclosure Voucher Issued NATION LAWYERS TRUST ACCOUNT // 99877 Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
February 20, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order Granting Disbursement of Surplus Funds TO DEFENDANT ROBERT WAYNE MARSHALL'S Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
February 20, 2022 | Docket Event |
No Further Judicial Action Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
February 15, 2022 | Hearing |
Motion Calendar MOTION TO DISBURSE SURPLUS FUNDS Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
February 09, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing- FEBRUARY 15, 2022 @ 9:00 AM Due Date: Complete Date: |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.