Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Pierre Louis, Jean Wesner, filed a(n) Other Civil Complaint (Non-Monetary) case against Jm Machinery Usa I Llc, Martinez, Maria, Melendez, Johan, in the jurisdiction of Miami-Dade County, FL, . Miami-Dade County, FL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 27, 2018 |
CategoryOther Civil Complaint (Non-Monetary) |
Last RefreshedSeptember 13, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationMiami-Dade County, FL |
|
This complaint is regarding a purchase of a low-boy trailer from Tosan Elendez on November 22, 20. The buyer, Jean Wesner Perre Louis, claims to have received an invoice for the purchase and wired the payment of $2,000. However, he states that he nev...
Memorandum of Disposition
Date: January 09, 2020Memorandum of Disposition
Date: November 13, 2019Memorandum
Date: October 17, 2018Answer
Date: August 23, 2018Complaint
Date: July 27, 2018Order of Dismissal (F.W.O.P.)
Date: November 07, 2019Order Vacating Order of Dismissal
Date: January 08, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 05, 2020 | Docket Event |
Returned Mail Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
February 11, 2020 | Docket Event |
Returned Mail Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
January 29, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing- 03/31/20@1:30PM Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
January 09, 2020 | Docket Event |
Memorandum of Disposition Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
January 08, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order Vacating Order of Dismissal Due Date: Complete Date: Parties: JM Machinery USA I LLC; Melendez Johan; Martinez Maria |
|
January 07, 2020 | Hearing |
Motion Calendar STATUS CONFERENCE Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
January 06, 2020 | Docket Event |
Returned Mail Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
December 23, 2019 | Docket Event |
Returned Mail Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
November 19, 2019 | Docket Event |
Returned Mail Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
November 15, 2019 | Docket Event |
Returned Mail Due Date: Complete Date: |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.