Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Andrews, Estella E, filed a(n) Other Civil Complaint (Non-Monetary) case against Andrews, Duane, in the jurisdiction of Miami-Dade County, FL, . Miami-Dade County, FL Superior Courts with Caryn Canner Schwartz presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 16, 2018 |
CategoryOther Civil Complaint (Non-Monetary) |
Last RefreshedJuly 18, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationMiami-Dade County, FL |
|
Complaint
Date: February 16, 2018Order of Dismissal (F.W.O.P.)
Date: October 20, 2020Letter of Correspondence
Date: July 29, 2020Memorandum
Date: March 08, 2018Motion for Final Judgment
Date: March 01, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 20, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal (F.W.O.P.) Due Date: Complete Date: Parties: Andrews Duane |
|
October 20, 2020 | Hearing |
FWOP Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
October 20, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal (F.W.O.P.) Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
July 29, 2020 | Docket Event |
Letter of Correspondence SHARONY ANDREWS GREEN Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
March 08, 2018 | Docket Event |
Memorandum TO ALL PARTIES FROM JUDGE CARYN SCHWARTZ Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
March 01, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion for Final Judgment Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
March 01, 2018 | Docket Event |
Non-Military Affidavit Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
March 01, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion for Default Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
March 01, 2018 | Docket Event |
Service Returned Due Date: Complete Date: Parties: Andrews Duane |
|
February 16, 2018 | Docket Event |
Complaint Due Date: Complete Date: |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.