Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Rocha, Maria, filed a(n) Discrimination - Labor and Employment case represented by Mcguinness, Lawrence J, against Ms2 Emporium, Inc., Saliba, Michel, in the jurisdiction of Miami-Dade County, FL, . Miami-Dade County, FL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2017 |
CategoryDiscrimination - Employment Or Other |
Last RefreshedOctober 13, 2023 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationMiami-Dade County, FL |
Matter TypeDiscrimination |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 22, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Removal to Federal Court *PER DNS' NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH ATTACHED COPY OF COMPLAINT AS EXHIBIT A Due Date: Complete Date: Parties: MS2 Emporium Inc.; Saliba Michel |
|
February 22, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Removal to Federal Court *PER DNS' NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH ATTACHED COPY OF COMPLAINT AS EXHIBIT A Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
February 12, 2018 | Docket Event |
Service Returned Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
January 19, 2018 | Docket Event |
Receipt: RECEIPT#:3160005 AMT PAID:$10.00 ALLOCATION CODE QUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE 1 $10.00 $10.00 TENDER TYPE:VISA CARD TENDER AMT:$30.00 RECEIPT DATE:01/19/2018 REGISTER#:316 CASHIER:MONICAA Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
January 05, 2018 | Docket Event |
Receipt: RECEIPT#:3430216 AMT PAID:$401.00 NAME:MCGUINNESS, LAWRENCE J MCGUINNESS & GONZALEZ, P.A. 3126 CENTER ST COCONUT GROVE FL 33133 ALLOCATION CODE QUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3100-CIRCUIT FILING FEE 1 $401.00 $401.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACH TENDER AMT:$401.00 RECEIPT DATE:01/05/2018 REGISTER#:343 CASHIER:EFILINGUSER Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
December 31, 2017 | Docket Event |
Complaint Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
December 31, 2017 | Docket Event |
Civil Cover Due Date: Complete Date: |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.