Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Dpkec Llc, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Brian Kopelowitz, against Inan, Fatma F, Kendall Square Homeowners Association Inc, Vizcaya Master Association Inc, in the jurisdiction of Miami-Dade County, FL, . Miami-Dade County, FL Superior Courts with Jacqueline Hogan Scola presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 22, 2017 |
CategoryRpmf -Non-Homestead ($50,001 - $249,999) |
Last RefreshedDecember 09, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationMiami-Dade County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: November 27, 2017Voluntary Dismissal
Date: September 19, 2017Order to Vacate Judgment
Date: March 13, 2018Reassignment Pursuant to Administrative Order
Date: May 13, 2020Motion to Dismiss
Date: March 13, 2018Motion:
Date: April 09, 2018Order to Cancel Sale Date
Date: February 21, 2018Complaint
Date: August 22, 2017Motion to Reset Sales Date
Date: February 16, 2018Order Vacating Sale
Date: April 12, 2018Summary Final Judgment
Date: January 11, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 13, 2020 | Docket Event |
Reassignment Pursuant to Administrative Order 20-B 24 AF CA 01 Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
April 12, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order Vacating Sale ORDER ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO VACATE FORECLOSURE SALE ON 04/09/18 ETC...(GRANTED) Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
April 10, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion for Telephonic Hearing Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
April 10, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order Granting Telephonic Hearing PLAINTIFF'S MOTION Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
April 09, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion: TO VACATE SALE Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
April 09, 2018 | Hearing |
Mortgage Foreclosure Sale Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
April 09, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing- 04/12/2018 Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
April 02, 2018 | Docket Event |
Mortgage Foreclosure Publication Fee FOR SALE OF 4/9/18 Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
March 13, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order to Vacate Judgment ORDER CANCELLING FORECLOSURE SALE SET FOR 04/09/18, VACATING SUMMARY FINAL JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE, RELEASING LIS PENDENS, DISMISSING COMPLAINT WITH PREJUDICE, AND RELEASING ORIGINAL DOCUMENTS (GRANTED, AND ORDER WAS RECEIVED AFTER PROPERTY WAS SOLD) Due Date: Complete Date: Parties: Inan Fatma F; Kendall Square Homeowners Association Inc; Vizcaya Master Association Inc |
|
March 13, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion to Dismiss Due Date: Complete Date: |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.