Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Olivera Molina, Wendy, filed a(n) General Family - Family case against Perez Gonzalez, Marco Alain, in the jurisdiction of Miami-Dade County, FL, . Miami-Dade County, FL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 14, 2017 |
CategoryOther Petition |
Last RefreshedFebruary 14, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationMiami-Dade County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Family |
Final Order
Date: October 25, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 25, 2017 | Docket Event |
Final Order DEFAULT ON SUPPLEMENTAL PETITION TO MODIFY TIME-SHARING SCHEDULE , CHILD SUPPORT & OTHER RELIEF GRANTING FULL CUSTODY Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
October 25, 2017 | Hearing |
Uncontested Calendar Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
October 25, 2017 | Docket Event |
Order of Default Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
September 19, 2017 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing- WEDNESDAY, OCTOBER 25, 2017 @ 930 AM Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
August 18, 2017 | Docket Event |
Motion for Default Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
July 28, 2017 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing- 09-20-17 Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
July 26, 2017 | Docket Event |
Proof of Publication Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
June 27, 2017 | Docket Event |
Notice of Action - Publication Due Date: Complete Date: Parties: Perez Gonzalez Marco Alain |
|
June 23, 2017 | Docket Event |
Affidavit of Diligent Search Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
June 20, 2017 | Docket Event |
Receipt: RECEIPT#:3470004 AMT PAID:$301.00 NAME:WESTERHOLD, ERNEST BRADLEY 2100 PONCE DE LEON BLVD STE 1210 CORAL GABLES FL 33134 ALLOCATION CODE QUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3300-CIRCUIT FILING FEE 1 $301.00 $301.00 TENDER TYPE:INDIGENT TENDER AMT:$301.00 RECEIPT DATE:06/20/2017 REGISTER#:347 CASHIER:EFILINGUSER Due Date: Complete Date: |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.