Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Borges, Maria E, filed a(n) General Family - Family case against Borges, Victor, Ii, in the jurisdiction of Miami-Dade County, FL, . Miami-Dade County, FL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 16, 2017 |
CategoryOther Petition |
Last RefreshedFebruary 14, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationMiami-Dade County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Family |
EOrder Of Dismissal by Judge
Date: May 12, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 12, 2020 | Docket Event |
EOrder Of Dismissal by Judge Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
April 10, 2020 | Docket Event |
E-filing Order TO PROGRESS CASE Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
February 11, 2019 | Docket Event |
Hearing Information Sheet Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
February 11, 2019 | Hearing |
Uncontested Calendar Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
February 11, 2019 | Docket Event |
Answer TO SUPPLEMENTAL PETITION Due Date: Complete Date: Parties: Borges Victor II |
|
January 09, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Final Hearing FEBRUARY 11, 2019 AT 10:00AM Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
November 08, 2017 | Docket Event |
Notice of Non-Jury Trial Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
September 22, 2017 | Docket Event |
Notice Designating Primary Email Address PETITIONERS AMENDED Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
September 20, 2017 | Docket Event |
Notice Designating Primary Email Address Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
August 04, 2017 | Docket Event |
Motion for Extension of Time FOR THE PETITIONER TO RESPOND TO THE SUMMONS Due Date: Complete Date: |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.