Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Castaneda Pino, Pedro Alexis, filed a(n) Other Civil Complaint case represented by Jason S Remer, against Universal Used Pallets Inc., in the jurisdiction of Miami-Dade County, FL, . Miami-Dade County, FL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 06, 2002 |
CategoryOther Civil Complaint |
Last RefreshedNovember 04, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationMiami-Dade County, FL |
|
This complaint is filed by Pedro Alexis Castaneda Pino against Universal Used Pallets Inc., a Florida Profit Corporation. The complaint alleges race-based discriminatory treatment of the plaintiff by the defendant, in violation of the Civil Rights Ac...
Service Returned
Date: September 21, 2017(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received
Date: June 21, 2017Civil Cover
Date: June 16, 2017Complaint
Date: June 16, 2017Stipulation
Date: October 09, 2017Court Correspondence Letter
Date: June 21, 2017Order of Dismissal
Date: October 31, 2017ESummons 20 Day Issued
Date: June 22, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 31, 2017 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal Due Date: Complete Date: Parties: UNIVERSAL USED PALLETS INC. |
|
October 31, 2017 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
October 09, 2017 | Docket Event |
Stipulation OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
September 21, 2017 | Docket Event |
Service Returned Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
June 23, 2017 | Docket Event |
Receipt: RECEIPT#:3480180 AMT PAID:$10.00 NAME:JASON S REMER 44 W FLAGLER ST STE 2200 MIAMI FL 33130-6807 ALLOCATION CODE QUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE 1 $10.00 $10.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACH TENDER AMT:$10.00 RECEIPT DATE:06/23/2017 REGISTER#:348 CASHIER:EFILINGUSER Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
June 22, 2017 | Docket Event |
ESummons 20 Day Issued Due Date: Complete Date: Parties: UNIVERSAL USED PALLETS INC. |
|
June 22, 2017 | Docket Event |
20 Day Summons Issued Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
June 22, 2017 | Docket Event |
20 Day Summons Issued Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
June 21, 2017 | Docket Event |
(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
June 21, 2017 | Docket Event |
Court Correspondence Letter Due Date: Complete Date: |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.