Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Melara, Rafael A, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Jugo, Steven George, against Miami-Dade County, represented by Frastai, Daniel, Levin, Sabrina, in the jurisdiction of Miami-Dade County, FL, . Miami-Dade County, FL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 16, 2017 |
CategoryAuto Negligence |
Last RefreshedSeptember 13, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationMiami-Dade County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Answer to Amended Complaint
Date: November 01, 2017Request for Production
Date: August 22, 2017Complaint
Date: June 16, 2017Order of Dismissal
Date: December 27, 2018Stipulation for Dismissal
Date: December 27, 2018Subpoena Served
Date: September 20, 2018Order Granting Motion to Leave to Amend
Date: October 13, 2017Motion to Dismiss
Date: July 17, 2017Mot to File Amended Complaint
Date: October 03, 2017Response to Request for Production
Date: August 25, 2017Notice of Answer to Interrogatories
Date: August 25, 2017Request for Production
Date: June 16, 2017Notice of Intent to Serve Subpoena
Date: August 23, 2018Subpoena Served
Date: September 18, 2018Subpoena Served
Date: September 12, 2018Request for Copies
Date: August 29, 2018Motion for Protective Order
Date: February 27, 2018Motion to Compel
Date: December 11, 2017Notice of Answer to Interrogatories
Date: December 11, 2017Reply to Affirmative Defenses
Date: November 03, 2017Response to Request for Admissions
Date: December 01, 2017Request for Admissions
Date: November 03, 2017Response to Request for Production
Date: November 03, 2017Notice of Answer to Interrogatories
Date: November 03, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 27, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal Due Date: Complete Date: Parties: Miami-Dade County |
|
December 27, 2018 | Docket Event |
Stipulation for Dismissal Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
December 27, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
September 20, 2018 | Docket Event |
Subpoena Served Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
September 18, 2018 | Docket Event |
Subpoena Served Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
September 12, 2018 | Docket Event |
Subpoena Served Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
September 07, 2018 | Docket Event |
Certificate of No Objections to Production Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
August 29, 2018 | Docket Event |
Request for Copies Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
August 29, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appearance Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
August 23, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Intent to Serve Subpoena Due Date: Complete Date: |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.