Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Espino, Adelfa, Espino, Otto, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Garcia, Senen Daniel, Ii, against Universal Property And Casualty Insurance Co.,, represented by Brant, Todd Edward, Thaxton, Robert, Esq, in the jurisdiction of Miami-Dade County, FL, . Miami-Dade County, FL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 16, 2017 |
CategoryContract & Indebtedness |
Last RefreshedSeptember 15, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationMiami-Dade County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Answer and Affirmative Defense
Date: August 17, 2017Mediators Report
Date: September 24, 2018Reassignment Pursuant to Administrative Order
Date: January 04, 2021Reassignment Pursuant to Administrative Order
Date: July 18, 2019Request for Production
Date: June 23, 2017Court Correspondence Letter
Date: June 21, 2017Order of Dismissal
Date: October 03, 2018Complaint
Date: June 16, 2017Notice of Appearance
Date: November 14, 2018Witness and Exhibit List
Date: September 20, 2018Notice of Appt of Medtrandcnfrnce
Date: August 15, 2018Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: August 14, 2018Order Setting Jury Trial
Date: July 09, 2018Order Setting Management Conference
Date: August 08, 2018Notice of Interrogatory
Date: June 23, 2017Notice of Appearance
Date: June 28, 2017(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received
Date: June 20, 2017ESummons 20 Day Issued
Date: June 21, 2017Civil Cover
Date: June 16, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
Reassignment Pursuant to Administrative Order AO 20-21 Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
July 18, 2019 | Docket Event |
Reassignment Pursuant to Administrative Order 19-05 Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
November 14, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appearance AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS : UPCICESERVICE03@UNIVERSALPROPERTY.COM Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
October 03, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal SETTLEMENT Due Date: Complete Date: Parties: Universal Property and Casualty Insurance Co. |
|
October 03, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
September 24, 2018 | Docket Event |
Mediators Report Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
September 20, 2018 | Docket Event |
Witness and Exhibit List Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
September 20, 2018 | Hearing |
Jury Trials Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
August 15, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appt of Medtrandcnfrnce Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
August 14, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Taking Deposition Due Date: Complete Date: |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.