Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Early Time Medical Center, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Lewis J Mertz, against Geico Indemnity Company, represented by Strauch, Annette M, in the jurisdiction of Miami-Dade County, FL, . Miami-Dade County, FL Superior Courts with Elijah A. Levitt presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 25, 2017 |
CategoryPersonal Injury Protection ($8,001 - $15,000) |
Last RefreshedDecember 09, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationMiami-Dade County, FL |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
This complaint is filed by Early Time Medical Center on behalf of Pedro Pina against Geico Indemnity Company. The complaint seeks damages in excess of $5,000.01 but less than $14,999.99 for medical services provided to Pedro Pina between March 1, 201...
Agreed Order
Date: October 07, 2020Agreed Order
Date: January 21, 2021Agreed Order
Date: August 11, 2020Order:
Date: July 24, 2020Motion to Compel
Date: February 12, 2020Motion:
Date: March 05, 2020Request for Production
Date: December 15, 2017Answer and Affirmative Defense
Date: December 11, 2017Complaint
Date: October 25, 2017Request for Admissions
Date: October 31, 2017Request for Production
Date: October 31, 2017Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: May 12, 2020Motion/petit for Enforcement
Date: September 16, 2020Request for Production
Date: May 20, 2020Motion to Compel
Date: July 21, 2020Motion:
Date: October 26, 2020Motion:
Date: August 10, 2020Motion:
Date: February 01, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 30, 2021 | Hearing |
Calendar Call Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
April 08, 2021 | Hearing | CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE VIA ZOOM Due Date: Complete Date: | |
March 24, 2021 | Hearing |
Motion Calendar PLAINTIFF'S FOURTH MOTION TO ENFORCE COURT ORDER AND FOR SANCTIONS FOR FAILING TO COMPLY WITH COURT ORDER ON INITIAL AND SUPPLEMENTAL DISCOVERY Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
February 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing- 03242021 0915 Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
February 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion: Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
January 25, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Case Management Conference APRIL 8TH, 2021 BEFORE JUDGE ELIJAH A. LEVITT AT 10:15 AM Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
January 25, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Jury Trial WEEK TRIAL PERIOD COMMENCING 05-17-2021 Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
January 21, 2021 | Docket Event |
Agreed Order ON PLAINTIFF S THIRD MOTION TO ENFORCE COURT ORDER AND FOR SANCTIONS FOR FAILING TO COMPLY WITH COURT ORDER ON INITIAL AND SUPPLEMENTAL DISCOVERY Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
October 26, 2020 | Docket Event |
Motion: Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
October 07, 2020 | Docket Event |
Agreed Order ON PLAINTIFF S SECOND MOTION TO ENFORCE COURT ORDER AND FOR SANCTIONS Due Date: Complete Date: |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.