Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Garcia Gadea, Silvia Aidalina, Hall, John E, filed a(n) Other Civil Complaint case against Clerk Of Court, in the jurisdiction of Miami-Dade County, FL, . Miami-Dade County, FL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 16, 2017 |
CategoryOther Civil Complaint |
Last RefreshedJuly 18, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationMiami-Dade County, FL |
|
Final Order by Judge
Date: September 27, 2017Reassignment Pursuant to Administrative Order
Date: January 04, 2021Final Order by Judge
Date: June 20, 2017Complaint
Date: June 16, 2017Reassignment Pursuant to Administrative Order
Date: July 18, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
Reassignment Pursuant to Administrative Order AO 20-21 Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
July 18, 2019 | Docket Event |
Reassignment Pursuant to Administrative Order 19-05 Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
September 27, 2017 | Docket Event |
Final Order by Judge TO AMEND MARRIAGE CERTIFICATE Due Date: Complete Date: Parties: Clerk of Court |
|
June 20, 2017 | Docket Event |
Final Order by Judge TO AMEND MARRIAGE CERTIFICATE Due Date: Complete Date: Parties: Clerk of Court |
|
June 20, 2017 | Docket Event |
Receipt: RECEIPT#:3100006 AMT PAID:$6.00 ALLOCATION CODE QUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3120-COPY 2 $1.00 $2.00 3121-CERTIFIED 2 $2.00 $4.00 TENDER TYPE:CASH TENDER AMT:$10.00 TENDER TYPE:CHANGE TENDER AMT:($4.00) RECEIPT DATE:06/20/2017 REGISTER#:310 CASHIER:MDANIEL Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
June 20, 2017 | Docket Event |
Final Order by Judge Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
June 16, 2017 | Docket Event |
Complaint PETITION TO AMEND MARRIAGE CERTIFICATE Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
June 16, 2017 | Docket Event |
Filed at Dade County Courthouse Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
June 16, 2017 | Docket Event |
Civil Cover Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
June 16, 2017 | Docket Event |
Receipt: RECEIPT#:2210032 AMT PAID:$401.00 ALLOCATION CODE QUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3100-CIRCUIT FILING FEE 1 $401.00 $401.00 TENDER TYPE:CASH TENDER AMT:$401.00 RECEIPT DATE:06/16/2017 REGISTER#:221 CASHIER:HPUPO Due Date: Complete Date: |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.