Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Lysius, Jayvon, filed a(n) General Family - Family case against Jones, Francheska, in the jurisdiction of Miami-Dade County, FL, . Miami-Dade County, FL Superior Courts with Deborah Magid presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 06, 2017 |
CategoryOther Petition |
Last RefreshedFebruary 17, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationMiami-Dade County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Family |
Final Judgment
Date: August 16, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 13, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order on Report of General Magistrate Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
March 22, 2018 | Docket Event |
Report of General Magistrate PETITIONER'S MOTION FOR CONTEMPT ENFORCEMENT ETC. Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
March 14, 2018 | Docket Event |
General Magistrate Record of Proceeding Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
February 08, 2018 | Hearing |
By General Magistrate Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
January 11, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing Before General Magistrate 2//8/2018 AT 3 PM DEBORAH MAGID Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
December 05, 2017 | Docket Event |
Objection to Referral of General Magistrate Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
November 06, 2017 | Docket Event |
Order of Referral to General Magistrate Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
October 27, 2017 | Docket Event |
Notice of Related Cases Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
October 27, 2017 | Docket Event |
Request for Hearing Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
October 27, 2017 | Docket Event |
Motion for Contempt /ENFORCEMENT Due Date: Complete Date: |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.