Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Universal Medical Services Corp., filed a(n) Other Civil Complaint (Non-Monetary) case represented by Landau Esq., Todd Andrew, against Imperial Fire And Casualty Insurance Company, represented by Jurysta, Victoria, Mordes, Benjamin C, in the jurisdiction of Miami-Dade County, FL, . Miami-Dade County, FL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 16, 2017 |
CategoryOther Civil Complaint (Non-Monetary) |
Last RefreshedDecember 09, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationMiami-Dade County, FL |
|
Complaint
Date: June 16, 2017Voluntary Dismissal
Date: October 06, 2017Motion for Extension of Time
Date: July 31, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 06, 2017 | Docket Event |
Voluntary Dismissal Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
August 02, 2017 | Docket Event |
Notice of Service of Process Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
July 31, 2017 | Docket Event |
Motion for Extension of Time Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
June 21, 2017 | Docket Event |
20 Day Summons Issued Due Date: Complete Date: Parties: IMPERIAL FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY |
|
June 21, 2017 | Docket Event |
20 Day Summons Issued Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
June 21, 2017 | Docket Event |
Receipt: RECEIPT#:3420068 AMT PAID:$10.00 NAME:LANDAU, TODD 1250 E HALLANDALE BEACH BLVD STE 304 HALLANDALE BEACH FL 33009-4641 ALLOCATION CODE QUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE 1 $10.00 $10.00 TENDER TYPE:CHECK TENDER AMT:$10.00 TENDER TYPE:CHECK TENDER AMT:$10.00 TENDER TYPE:CHECK TENDER AMT:$10.00 TENDER TYPE:CHECK TENDER AMT:$10.00 TENDER TYPE:CHECK TENDER AMT:$10.00 RECEIPT DATE:06/21/2017 REGISTER#:342 CASHIER:CG8 Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
June 19, 2017 | Docket Event |
Receipt: RECEIPT#:2160098 AMT PAID:$300.00 NAME:LANDAU, TODD 1250 E HALLANDALE BEACH BLVD STE 703 HALLANDALE BEACH FL 33009-4641 ALLOCATION CODE QUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2100-COUNTY FILING FEE 1 $300.00 $300.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACH TENDER AMT:$300.00 RECEIPT DATE:06/19/2017 REGISTER#:216 CASHIER:EFILINGUSER Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
June 16, 2017 | Docket Event |
Complaint Due Date: Complete Date: |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.