Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Bayside Office Center Llc, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Kramer, Jennifer J, Shapiro, Lyle Eric, against Abhiratvorakul, Amorn, Abhiratvorakul, Ponrathorn, Mcnamara, Shawn, Ricebarn Group Inc, Talerico, Frank, (total of 6) See All represented by Boyle, John J., Kramer, Jennifer J, in the jurisdiction of Miami-Dade County, FL, . Miami-Dade County, FL Superior Courts with Teretha Lundy Thomas presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 22, 2017 |
CategoryContract & Indebtedness |
Last RefreshedApril 21, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationMiami-Dade County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 13, 2017 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal & DISBURSING FUNDS FROM COURT REGISTRY Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
April 13, 2017 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal & DISBURSING COURT REGISTRY FUNDS Due Date: Complete Date: Parties: TOKYO BLUE GROUP OF MIAMI LLC; RICEBARN GROUP INC; TALERICO FRANK; ABHIRATVORAKUL AMORN; ABHIRATVORAKUL PONRATHORN; MCNAMARA SHAWN |
|
April 12, 2017 | Docket Event |
Motion to Dismiss Due Date: Complete Date: Parties: Boyle John J.; Shapiro Lyle Eric; Kramer Jennifer J; BAYSIDE OFFICE CENTER LLC; TOKYO BLUE GROUP OF MIAMI LLC; RICEBARN GROUP INC; TALERICO FRANK; ABHIRATVORAKUL AMORN; ABHIRATVORAKUL PONRATHORN; MCNAMARA SHAWN |
|
April 12, 2017 | Docket Event |
Order: DETERMINING TRIAL JUDGE TERETHA LUNDY THOMAS Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
March 31, 2017 | Docket Event |
Notice of Compliance Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
March 22, 2017 | Docket Event |
Filed at Dade County Courthouse Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
March 22, 2017 | Docket Event |
Complaint FILED IN ORIGINAL CASE Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
March 22, 2017 | Docket Event |
Receipt: RECEIPT#:2140021 AMT PAID:$216.00 NAME:RELATED CASE 201615870CC05 ALLOCATION CODE QUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3100-CIRCUIT FILING FEE 1 $216.00 $216.00 TENDER TYPE:CHECK TENDER AMT:$216.00 RECEIPT DATE:03/22/2017 REGISTER#:214 CASHIER:CASSEUS Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
March 22, 2017 | Docket Event |
Letter of Correspondence TO ERIC SHAPIRO, JOHN BOYLE & JENNIFER KRAMER (CASE TRANSFFERED FROM COUNTY COURT Due Date: Complete Date: |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.