Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
B & B Prohealth Rehabilitation, Inc., filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Valdes, Leonard J, against Imperial Fire & Casualty Insurance Company, represented by Mordes, Benjamin C, in the jurisdiction of Miami-Dade County, FL, . Miami-Dade County, FL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 16, 2017 |
CategoryPersonal Injury Protection ($8,001 - $15,000) |
Last RefreshedSeptember 13, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationMiami-Dade County, FL |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Request for Admissions
Date: June 28, 2017Motion for Extension of Time
Date: August 18, 2017Complaint
Date: June 16, 2017Motion for Extension of Time
Date: July 25, 2017Request for Production
Date: June 28, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 03, 2017 | Docket Event |
Voluntary Dismissal Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
August 18, 2017 | Docket Event |
Motion for Extension of Time Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
August 01, 2017 | Docket Event |
Notice of Unavailability/absence Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
July 25, 2017 | Docket Event |
Motion for Extension of Time Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
June 28, 2017 | Docket Event |
Request for Admissions Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
June 28, 2017 | Docket Event |
Request for Production Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
June 28, 2017 | Docket Event |
Notice of Taking Deposition Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
June 28, 2017 | Docket Event |
Notice of Interrogatory Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
June 20, 2017 | Docket Event |
Receipt: RECEIPT#:3500008 AMT PAID:$10.00 NAME:VALDES, LEONARD J 8660 W FLAGLER ST STE 124 MIAMI FL 33144-2035 ALLOCATION CODE QUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE 1 $10.00 $10.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACH TENDER AMT:$10.00 RECEIPT DATE:06/20/2017 REGISTER#:350 CASHIER:EFILINGUSER Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
June 19, 2017 | Docket Event |
20 Day Summons Issued Due Date: Complete Date: |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.