Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Jean-Claude, Jean Patrick, filed a(n) Estate Administration - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Miami-Dade County, FL, . Miami-Dade County, FL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 10, 2018 |
CategorySummary Administration $1000 & Over |
Last RefreshedFebruary 14, 2021 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationMiami-Dade County, FL |
Matter TypeEstate Administration |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 25, 2020 | Docket Event |
Certified Copy Mailed Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
November 16, 2020 | Docket Event |
Certified Copy Request 1 CC AMD ORDER OF SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION TO SUSAN E DURRE' Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
May 12, 2020 | Docket Event |
Certified Copy Request 1 CC AMENDED ORDER OF SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION TO SUSAN E DURRE Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
May 12, 2020 | Docket Event |
Certified Copy Mailed Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
May 01, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order for Reinstatement of Case Probate Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
May 01, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order of Summary Administration AMENDED Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
May 01, 2018 | Hearing |
Probate Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
May 01, 2018 | Docket Event |
SRS Disposed by Judge (Case Status Closed) Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
May 01, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Confidential Info Within Court Filing Accepted ATTACHED RETAINER AGREEMENT & CHECKS PAID BY JEAN PATRICK JEAN-CLAUDE (SEALED) Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
April 13, 2018 | Docket Event |
Receipt: RECEIPT#:3510004 AMT PAID:$50.00 NAME:DURRE, SUSAN E 6601 SW 80TH ST STE 121 SOUTH MIAMI FL 33143-4661 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODE QUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3414-REOPEN CP/GD CASES 1 $50.00 $50.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACH TENDER AMT:$50.00 RECEIPT DATE:04/13/2018 REGISTER#:351 CASHIER:EFILINGUSER Due Date: Complete Date: |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.