Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Guardianship Program Of Dade County, Inc., filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Miami-Dade County, FL, . Miami-Dade County, FL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 25, 2019 |
CategoryPlenary Guardianship Of Person And Property |
Last RefreshedNovember 26, 2022 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationMiami-Dade County, FL |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 16, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order of Discharge Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
September 16, 2019 | Docket Event |
SRS Disposed by Judge (Case Status Closed) Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
August 28, 2019 | Docket Event |
Receipt: OF ADDT'L OF $267.88 Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
August 28, 2019 | Docket Event |
Receipt: RECEIPT#:3100010 AMT PAID:$267.88 NAME:LESSER, CAREN 8300 NW 53RD ST STE 402 MIAMI FL 33166-7713 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODE QUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3402-ADD'L FILING FEE 1 $267.88 $267.88 TENDER TYPE:CHECK TENDER AMT:$267.88 RECEIPT DATE:08/28/2019 REGISTER#:310 CASHIER:OHADDOC Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
July 19, 2019 | Docket Event |
Petition for Distribution Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
July 19, 2019 | Docket Event |
Report: OF FINAL RETURN OF GUARDIAN OF PROPERTY - CASE CLOSED PRIOR TO AUDIT. Due Date: 09/25/2019 Complete Date: 09/25/2019 |
|
July 01, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order Approving Annual Report PLAN 2019, ACCOUNTG 1/1/18 12/31/18 Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
June 17, 2019 | Docket Event |
Next Guardianship Accounting Due Due Date: 04/01/2020 Complete Date: 07/19/2019 |
|
May 02, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order: AUTHORZ GUARDN T/CLOSE WARDS ACCT , ETC Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
April 17, 2019 | Docket Event |
Death Certificate ORGNL Due Date: Complete Date: Parties: Gordon Joe W |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.