Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Nikac, Vilma, filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Miami-Dade County, FL, . Miami-Dade County, FL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 27, 2019 |
CategoryPlenary Guardianship Of Person And Property |
Last RefreshedFebruary 14, 2021 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationMiami-Dade County, FL |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 26, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
September 26, 2019 | Docket Event |
SRS Disposed by Judge (Case Status Closed) Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
September 05, 2019 | Hearing |
Status Hearing STATUS Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
June 27, 2019 | Hearing |
Status Hearing WAS SET ON 5/21- SHOULD BE CLOSED BY 6/6 Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
June 26, 2019 | Docket Event |
Motion for Extension of Time SECOND AND FINAL Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
June 26, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order: ON SECOND AND FINAL MOTION FOR EXT OF TIME TO COMPLY WITH GD SUA SPONTE (30 DAYS FROM THE DATE OF THIS ORDER) Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
May 21, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order of Continuance & RESETTG HEARING 6/27/19 AT 9.00 AM Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
May 21, 2019 | Hearing |
Show Cause Hearing Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
May 21, 2019 | Docket Event |
Motion for Extension of Time Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
April 15, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause 5/21/19 AT 11.00 AM Due Date: Complete Date: |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.