Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Morales, Elia Carmen, filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Miami-Dade County, FL, . Miami-Dade County, FL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 10, 2018 |
CategoryPlenary Guardianship Of Person And Property |
Last RefreshedFebruary 14, 2021 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationMiami-Dade County, FL |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 16, 2019 | Hearing |
Show Cause Hearing GLORIA GONZALEZ EXCUSTED FROM SHOW CAUSE HEARING (W/D.) Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
October 16, 2019 | Docket Event |
SRS Disposed by Judge (Case Status Closed) Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
October 15, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
October 09, 2019 | Docket Event |
Initial Inventory Assets LT $25,000 No Charge FROM 10-09-2019 THRU 10-09-2019 N Due Date: 08/19/2017 Complete Date: 10/23/2019 |
|
October 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
Initial Inventory Assets LT $25,000 No Charge FROM 10-08-2019 THRU 10-08-2019 N CASE CLOSED 10/16/19 PRIOR TO AUDIT Due Date: 08/19/2017 Complete Date: 10/23/2019 |
|
October 07, 2019 | Docket Event |
Initial Guardianship Plan 2017 CASE CLOSED 10/16/19 PRIOR TO AUDIT Due Date: 08/19/2017 Complete Date: 10/23/2019 |
|
October 02, 2019 | Hearing |
Special Appointment W/D. NINA 3058270035 Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
October 02, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order: MOTI WITHDRW AS ATTORNEY Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
August 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice: OF INTENT NOT TO APPEAR AT OCTOBER 16, 2019 HEARING Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
August 05, 2019 | Docket Event |
Florida Dept of Law Enforcement Background Check Report ELIA C. MORALES Due Date: Complete Date: |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.