Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Triche, Lourdes, filed a(n) Estate Administration - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Miami-Dade County, FL, . Miami-Dade County, FL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 16, 2017 |
CategoryAdministration |
Last RefreshedFebruary 14, 2021 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationMiami-Dade County, FL |
Matter TypeEstate Administration |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 23, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order Case Pending Resolution Other Case Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
October 20, 2020 | Docket Event |
Petition for Extension of Time Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
October 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order Extending Time for UNTIL APRIL 30,2020. Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
September 30, 2019 | Docket Event |
Petition for Extension of Time (EXTNESION FOR 4-30-2020). Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
May 31, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order Authorizing Settlement FINAL ON PET F/APPRVL O/PROPOSED APPORTIONMT O/UNISURED MOTORIST , ETC Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
May 16, 2018 | Docket Event |
Exhibit List * KEPT NEXT TO FILE. Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
May 16, 2018 | Docket Event |
Text *PETITIONER EXHIBIT #10 IN EVIDENCE(TOOK PALCE OF 1- J). Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
May 16, 2018 | Docket Event |
Text *PETITIONER EXHIBIT #12 IN EVIDENCE(TOOK PLACE OF 1-O). Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
May 16, 2018 | Docket Event |
Text *** RESPONDENT EXHIBIT #A,, IN EVIDENCE(TOOK PLACE OF A-2 ID). Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
May 16, 2018 | Docket Event |
Text *** RESPONDENT EXHIBIT #B,, IN EVIDENCE(TOOK PLACE OF A-1). Due Date: Complete Date: |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.